USA et al v. K.P. Kauffman Company, Inc.

Plaintiff: State of Colorado, The and USA
Defendant: K.P. Kauffman Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02559
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 Filing 9 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff USA All parties do not consent.. (Freeman, James)
October 29, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by USA. K.P. Kauffman Company, Inc. waiver sent on 10/10/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Freeman, James)
October 23, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance for Robyn L. Wille by Robyn Lynn Wille on behalf of State of Colorado, TheAttorney Robyn Lynn Wille added to party State of Colorado, The(pty:pla) (Wille, Robyn)
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance for Paul M. Seby by Paul Martin Seby on behalf of K.P. Kauffman Company, Inc.Attorney Paul Martin Seby added to party K.P. Kauffman Company, Inc.(pty:dft) (Seby, Paul)
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 APPENDIX re #1 Complaint Appendix A to Complaint by Plaintiff USA. (Freeman, James)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. The parties are directed to jointly contact Chambers by telephone at (303) 844-4694 or by email at Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov to obtain a scheduling conference date. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/9/18. (rbjsec. )
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (dbera, )
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against K.P. Kauffman Company, Inc. Attorney James D. Freeman added to party United States(pty:pla), filed by United States, State of Colorado. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Freeman, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA et al v. K.P. Kauffman Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Colorado, The
Represented By: Claybourne Fox Clarke, IV
Represented By: Robyn Lynn Wille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Alexandra Barrett Sherertz
Represented By: James D. Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K.P. Kauffman Company, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Martin Seby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?