In re: Stemwedel

Interested Party: United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado and U.S. Trustee
Appellant: Robert J. Stemwedel and Linda A. Kelly
Appellee: Peak Prop. and Dev. Corp.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02590
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y Daniel
Referring Judge: Marcia S Krieger
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2018 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-02590-MSK. (athom, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 17 CASE REASSIGNED. Your AP case is at issue. Pursuant to #16 Order and Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1 this case is randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-02590 REB. (Text Only Entry) (evana, )
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DIRECTING REASSIGNMENT. After carefully reviewing the pending motion and relief sought, I find the issues to be sufficiently intertwined with the merits of the underlying controversy to suggest that the AP judge should refrain from resolving those issues to avoid binding the merits judge to a ruling which he or she may view differently. Thus, I order that this case be randomly drawn to a merits judge. THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED that the clerk of the court shall assign this case to a judge for resolution on the merits under the random assignment procedure of D.C.COLO.LCiv.R 40.1., by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/4/2018. (evana, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 15 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opening and Response Briefs by Appellant Robert J. Stemwedel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Goff, Lance)
November 30, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal or, In the Alternative, To Remand Appeal to Permit the Bankruptcy Court to Modify its Order and Judgment Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 60 and Fed.R.Bankr.P. 9024 by Appellee Peak Prop. and Dev. Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Order, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 - Judgment, #3 Exhibit Ex 3 - Award, #4 Exhibit Ex 4 - Motion, #5 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Gomez, Christina)
November 30, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Limited by Matthew Jerome Ochs on behalf of Peak Prop. and Dev. Corp. Attorney Matthew Jerome Ochs added to party Peak Prop. and Dev. Corp. (pty:e) (Ochs, Matthew)
November 30, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Limited by Christina Finzel Gomez on behalf of Peak Prop. and Dev. Corp. Attorney Christina Finzel Gomez added to party Peak Prop. and Dev. Corp. (pty:e) (Gomez, Christina)
November 29, 2018 Filing 11 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 3: Transcript of Non-Evidentiary Hearing Proceedings, June 13, 2018, before the Honorable Elizabeth E. Brown (Restricted until 2/19/2019) (evana, )
November 29, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Supplemental Record re #7 BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL. Number of Volume II Restricted Documents Transcripts (evana, )
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Establishing Bankruptcy Appeal Briefing Requirements by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/14/2018. (cthom, )
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL. Number of Volumes: 1. Appellant Brief due by 12/8/2018. Appellee Brief due by 1/7/2019. Appellant Reply Brief due by 1/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Volume I) (athom, )
October 9, 2018 Filing 9 CASE OPENING. The above captioned case was opened on 10/9/2018 and assigned the case number referenced above. After docketing of the record on appeal from the U.S. Bankruptcy Court, briefing will proceed in accordance with Bankruptcy Rules 8014, 8015, and 8018, and any orders of the court. When referencing trial exhibits you must attach copies to your brief. If the court finds it necessary to have the originals presented it will issue an order. All filings with the United States District Court, unless otherwise permitted by our Electronic Case Filing Procedures, must be done electronically. Text Only Entry. (agarc, )
October 9, 2018 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (cmadr, )
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL RECORD AVAILABILITY re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (cmadr, )
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Granting Motion for Determination Regarding Disposition of Estate Asset filed by Peak by U.S. Bankruptcy Judge Elizabeth E. Brown on 27 September, 2018. (cmadr, )
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Transmittal of Appeal Pursuant to Rule 8003(d) re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Judgment)(cmadr, )
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT by Appellants Linda A. Kelly, Robert J. Stemwedel in re: Order and Judgment of 9/27/2018. (cmadr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Stemwedel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: U.S. Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Robert J. Stemwedel
Represented By: Lance J. Goff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Linda A. Kelly
Represented By: Lance J. Goff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Peak Prop. and Dev. Corp.
Represented By: Christina Finzel Gomez
Represented By: Matthew Jerome Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?