United States of America v. Dunson
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Cynthia R. Dunson
Case Number: 1:2018cv02601
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Student Loan
Cause of Action: 28:3001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Cynthia R. Dunson served on 10/26/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. (Gillespie, William)
October 12, 2018 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (athom, )
October 12, 2018 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-02601-KMT. (athom, )
October 11, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (dbera, )
October 11, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
October 11, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Cynthia R. Dunson by Plaintiff United States of America. (Gillespie, William)
October 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cynthia R. Dunson Attorney William Bennett Gillespie added to party United States of America(pty:pla), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Certificate of Indebtedness, #2 Exhibit 2: NHSC/LRP Contract, #3 Exhibit 3: Worksheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gillespie, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Dunson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia R. Dunson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: William Bennett Gillespie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?