Windhorst v. BNSF Railway Company
Plaintiff: Arthur F. Windhorst
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv02680
Filed: October 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:0056
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Ayshan E. Ibrahim by Ayshan Ibrahim on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Ayshan Ibrahim added to party BNSF Railway Company(pty:dft) (Ibrahim, Ayshan)
November 27, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Keith M. Goman by Keith M. Goman on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Keith M. Goman added to party BNSF Railway Company(pty:dft) (Goman, Keith)
November 27, 2018 Filing 9 Defendant BNSF Railway Company's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, And Jury Demand by BNSF Railway Company.(Floyd, William)
November 27, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of William R. Floyd by William Robert Floyd on behalf of All Defendants Attorney William Robert Floyd added to party BNSF Railway Company(pty:dft) (Floyd, William)
November 5, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (tsher, )
October 30, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS REQUEST as to BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY by Plaintiff Arthur F. Windhorst. (Monroe, Stephen)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Non-Consent Form, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 10/22/2018. Consent/Non-Consent Form due on or before 12/26/2018. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 1/9/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (slibi, )
October 22, 2018 Filing 4 Administrative Notice: Duplicate filing fee received. Financial notified and a refund is pending. (Text Only Entry) (rvill, )
October 22, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No Summons Issued. (rvill, )
October 21, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
October 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BNSF Railway Company (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6354485)Attorney Stephen Frederick Monroe added to party Arthur F. Windhorst(pty:pla), filed by Arthur F. Windhorst. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Monroe, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Windhorst v. BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur F. Windhorst
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: William Robert Floyd
Represented By: Keith M. Goman
Represented By: Ayshan Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?