Knetzer v. Dick et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Knetzer
Defendant: Thode, Executive Director of CDOC, Hall, Sterling Internal Classifications Committe, Warden of SCF, Busch, Robert Dick, Anthony A. DeCesaro, Marshall Griffith, CoreCivic, Josh Dorcey and CoreCivic/CCA
Case Number: 1:2018cv02707
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Filing 9 PAYMENT RECEIVED from Matthew Knetzer in the amount of $ 46.97; Receipt Number COX088000; Monthly Payment. (evana, )
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that the Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 (ECF No. #3 ) is granted. That within thirty days of the date of this Order Plaintiff's custodian shall disburse from Plaintiff's prison account an initial partial filing fee of $46.97 to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of Colorado, which represents 20 percent of the greater of the (1) average monthly deposits, or (2) average monthly balance in Plaintiff's prison account for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint. See 28 U.S.C. 1915 (b). That after payment of the initial partial filing fee Plaintiff's custodian shall disburse from Plaintiff's prison account monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to his prison account until Plaintiff has paid the total filing fee of $350.00. See 28 U.S.C. 1915 (b)(2). Interference by Plaintiff in the submission of these funds will result in the dismissal of this action. That the Clerk of the Court shall not issue process until further order of the Court. That the Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of this Order to DOC_inmateaccounts@state.co.us., by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/5/2018.(mailed as Ordered) (evana, )
December 3, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against CoreCivic/CCA, Anthony A. DeCesaro, Robert Dick, Marshall Griffith, Sterling Internal Classifications Committe , Thode, Executive Director of CDOC , filed by Matthew Knetzer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(evana, )
December 3, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE re compliance with #4 Order, by Plaintiff Matthew Knetzer (evana, )
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to request court appointed legal assistant/paralegal by Plaintiff Matthew Knetzer. (evana, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/4/2018: #1 Continuation of Main Document) (evana, ). (Modified on 12/4/2018 added attachment to Motion Titled Prayer for Relief)(evana, ).
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES AND FILE AMENDED PRISONER COMPLAINT within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that, if Plaintiff fails to file an amended prisoner complaint that complies with this order within the time allowed, the action will be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 10/29/2018. (evana, )
October 23, 2018 Filing 3 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, by Plaintiff Matthew Knetzer. (rvill, )
October 23, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 Prisoner's 1983 Complaint with Jury Demand for 8th Amend. Violations for Failure to Protect, and 1st Amend. Violations for Denial of Access to the Courts against all Defendants, filed by Matthew Knetzer.(rvill, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knetzer v. Dick et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Director of CDOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Internal Classifications Committe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden of SCF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Busch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Dick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony A. DeCesaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CoreCivic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Dorcey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CoreCivic/CCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Knetzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?