Perseverance MED, LLC v. Trujillo et al

Plaintiff: Perseverance MED, LLC
Defendant: Yanaba Services, LLC, Tru-Management, Inc., Marcel Trujillo, Tru-Investments, LLC and Anthony J. Trujillo
Case Number: 1:2018cv02719
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Perseverance MED, LLC. Tru-Investments, LLC waiver sent on 11/15/2018, answer due 1/14/2019; Tru-Management, Inc. waiver sent on 11/15/2018, answer due 1/14/2019; Anthony J. Trujillo waiver sent on 11/15/2018, answer due 1/14/2019; Marcel Trujillo waiver sent on 11/15/2018, answer due 1/14/2019; Yanaba Services, LLC waiver sent on 11/15/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (Thompson, Nathaniel)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Amended ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 2/4/2019 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/07/2018. (ksena)
December 6, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Barry Kevin Arrington on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Barry Kevin Arrington added to party Tru-Investments, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Barry Kevin Arrington added to party Tru-Management, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Barry Kevin Arrington added to party Anthony J. Trujillo(pty:dft), Attorney Barry Kevin Arrington added to party Marcel Trujillo(pty:dft), Attorney Barry Kevin Arrington added to party Yanaba Services, LLC(pty:dft) (Arrington, Barry)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 1/2/2019 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/26/2018. (ksena)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Magistrate Judge Tafoya is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference, and should be available for trial accordingly. FURTHER, Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 10/25/2018. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
October 24, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rroge, )
October 24, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
October 24, 2018 Filing 2 Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number COX087301 by Plaintiff Perseverance MED, LLC re: #1 Complaint, (rroge, )
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tru-Investments, LLC, Tru-Management, Inc., Anthony J. Trujillo, Marcel Trujillo, Yanaba Services, LLC Attorney Thomas H. Mitchiner added to party Perseverance MED, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Perseverance MED, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Anthony Trujillo Summons, #3 Summons Marcel Trujillo Summons, #4 Summons Tru-Investments Summons, #5 Summons Tru-Management, #6 Summons Yannaba Services Summons)(Mitchiner, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perseverance MED, LLC v. Trujillo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yanaba Services, LLC
Represented By: Barry Kevin Arrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tru-Management, Inc.
Represented By: Barry Kevin Arrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcel Trujillo
Represented By: Barry Kevin Arrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tru-Investments, LLC
Represented By: Barry Kevin Arrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony J. Trujillo
Represented By: Barry Kevin Arrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perseverance MED, LLC
Represented By: Thomas H. Mitchiner
Represented By: Nathaniel J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?