Li et al v. Homesite Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Phuong Pham and Chen Li
Defendant: Homesite Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv02720
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Raymond P Moore
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 1/15/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 12/7/2018. (jgonz, )
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 12/6/2018. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 12/6/2018. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
December 6, 2018 Filing 16 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #15 Memorandum Returning Case This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-02720 RM. (Text Only Entry) (evana, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE for reassignment by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock (evana, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 14 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #13 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-02720-LTB. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiffs Chen Li, Phuong Pham All parties do not consent.. (Burchard, Timothy)
October 26, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion to Consolidate by Defendant Homesite Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stafford, Elaine)
October 26, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Homesite Insurance Company.(Stafford, Elaine)
October 25, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Larry E. Bache, Jr on behalf of Chen Li, Phuong PhamAttorney Larry E. Bache, Jr added to party Chen Li(pty:pla), Attorney Larry E. Bache, Jr added to party Phuong Pham(pty:pla) (Bache, Larry)
October 25, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Timothy Graham Burchard, II on behalf of Chen Li, Phuong PhamAttorney Timothy Graham Burchard, II added to party Chen Li(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy Graham Burchard, II added to party Phuong Pham(pty:pla) (Burchard, Timothy)
October 25, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathan Edward Bukowski on behalf of Chen Li, Phuong PhamAttorney Jonathan Edward Bukowski added to party Chen Li(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan Edward Bukowski added to party Phuong Pham(pty:pla) (Bukowski, Jonathan)
October 25, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Edward Duane Dillon on behalf of Homesite Insurance CompanyAttorney Edward Duane Dillon added to party Homesite Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Dillon, Edward)
October 25, 2018 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rvill, )
October 24, 2018 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
October 24, 2018 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Homesite Insurance Company on 10/12/2018. (rvill, )
October 24, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Homesite Insurance Company, filed by Chen Li and Phuong Pham.(rvill, )
October 24, 2018 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rvill, )
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Homesite Insurance Company from Denver District Court, Case Number 2018CV33753. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6361388), filed by Homesite Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A-1 Docket Sheet, #2 Appendix A-2 Complaint and Jury Demand Part 1, #3 Appendix A-2 Complaint and Jury Demand Part 2, #4 Appendix A-2 Complaint and Jury Demand Part 3, #5 Appendix A-2 Complaint and Jury Demand Part 4, #6 Appendix A-3 District Court Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Appendix A-4 Summons, #8 Appendix A-5 Pre-Trial Order, #9 Appendix A-6 Delay Reduction Order, #10 Appendix A-7 Return of Service, #11 Appendix A-8 Entry of Appearance Defendant, #12 Appendix A-9 Entry of Plaintiff Part 1, #13 Appendix A-9 Entry of Plaintiff Part 2, #14 Appendix A-10 Notice of Removal State Court, #15 Appendix A-11 Secretary of State, #16 Civil Cover Sheet Signed)(Stafford, Elaine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Li et al v. Homesite Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phuong Pham
Represented By: Larry E. Bache, Jr.
Represented By: Timothy Graham Burchard, II
Represented By: Jonathan Edward Bukowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chen Li
Represented By: Larry E. Bache, Jr.
Represented By: Timothy Graham Burchard, II
Represented By: Jonathan Edward Bukowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homesite Insurance Company
Represented By: Elaine Katherine Stafford
Represented By: Edward Duane Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?