USA v. Rajput

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Ferren S. Rajput
Case Number: 1:2018cv02731
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by USA. Ferren S. Rajput waiver sent on 11/5/2018, answer due 1/4/2019. (Halverson, Alex)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 1/8/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 12/26/2018, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 10/26/2018. (jgonz, )
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rroge, )
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ferren S. Rajput Attorney Alex Ryan Halverson added to party United States of America, The(pty:pla), filed by United States of America, The. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Halverson, Alex)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Rajput
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ferren S. Rajput
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Alex Ryan Halverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?