Ferguson Enterprises, Inc. v. International Concept Management, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ferguson Enterprises, Inc.
Defendant: International Concept Management, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02763
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Filing 43 AMENDED ANSWER to with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against International Concept Management, Inc. by Counter Claimant International Concept Management, Inc., Defendant International Concept Management, Inc.. (Driscoll, Jeffrey)
December 13, 2018 Filing 42 REPLY to Response to #28 MOTION for Reconsideration re #15 Order MOTION to Remand filed by Plaintiff Ferguson Enterprises, Inc.. (Cash, Webster)
December 4, 2018 Filing 41 Utility Setting : Status Conference set for 8/26/2019 10:00 AM in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher pursuant to #40 Minute Entry. Text Only Entry (jgonz, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 40 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher: Scheduling Conference held on 12/4/2018. Discussion held re scheduling matters and Scheduling Order entered. Status Conference set for 8/26/2019 at 10:00 AM in Room 323 in Grand Junction before Magistrate Judge Gallagher - telephone appearance pre-approved so long as parties coordinate and all are on one line prior to calling in to (970) 241-8932, Extension 8235. APPEARANCES: B. Lee Wertz and Webster Cash, III, for Plaintiffs and Jeffrey Driscoll for Defendants, all in person. FTR: Grand Junction. (gpgsec, ) Text Only Entry Modified on 12/6/2018 to correct status conference date (jgonz, ).
December 4, 2018 Filing 39 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim by Counter Defendant Ferguson Enterprises, Inc., Plaintiff Ferguson Enterprises, Inc.. (Robertson, Eric)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATED ORDER for the Disclosure of Privileged Information by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/30/2018. (jgonz, )
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/30/2018. (jgonz, )
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Protective Order; granting #33 Motion for Protective Order by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/30/2018. Text Only Entry (jgonz, )
November 29, 2018 Filing 35 RESPONSE to #28 MOTION for Reconsideration re #15 Order MOTION to Remand filed by Defendant International Concept Management, Inc.. (Driscoll, Jeffrey)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM regarding #32 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order filed by Ferguson Enterprises, Inc., #33 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order for the Disclosure of Privileged Information filed by Ferguson Enterprises, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/29/18. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
November 29, 2018 Filing 33 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order for the Disclosure of Privileged Information by Plaintiff Ferguson Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - [Proposed] Stipulated Order for the Disclosure of Privileged Information)(Cash, Webster)
November 29, 2018 Filing 32 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff Ferguson Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - [Proposed] Stipulated Protective Order)(Cash, Webster)
November 26, 2018 Filing 31 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Ferguson Enterprises, Inc.. (Cash, Webster)
November 26, 2018 Filing 30 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Counter Defendant Ferguson Enterprises, Inc., Plaintiff Ferguson Enterprises, Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Cash, Webster)
November 13, 2018 Filing 29 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Ferguson Enterprises, Inc. by International Concept Management, Inc..(Driscoll, Jeffrey)
November 8, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION for Reconsideration re #15 Order , MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff Ferguson Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit A to Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit B to Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Cash, Webster)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/3/2018 09:45 AM in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher.A Scheduling Conference is set in GRAND JUNCTION, Colorado at the Wayne Aspinall Federal Building - United States Courthouse, 400 Rood Avenue, Grand Junction, CO 81501 before U.S. Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. The parties shall comply with the Instructions to Scheduling Order for U.S. Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher which can be found at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Parties concerned regarding travel time and expense to Grand Junction for appearances before the Magistrate Judge are referred to this Magistrate Judge's policy in that regard which can be found at the above website. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on November 7, 2018. Text Only Entry (gpgsec, )
November 6, 2018 Filing 26 REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Pursuant to #25 Minute Order, this action is directly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-02763-PAB-GPG. (Text Only Entry). (sphil, )
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/06/2018. ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall reassign this matter from Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. (sphil, )
October 31, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Amended by Eric Lindsay Robertson on behalf of Ferguson Enterprises, Inc. (Robertson, Eric)
October 31, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Eric Lindsay Robertson on behalf of Ferguson Enterprises, Inc.Attorney Eric Lindsay Robertson added to party Ferguson Enterprises, Inc.(pty:pla) (Robertson, Eric)
October 31, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Webster Cofield Cash, III on behalf of Ferguson Enterprises, Inc.Attorney Webster Cofield Cash, III added to party Ferguson Enterprises, Inc.(pty:pla) (Cash, Webster)
October 30, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jeffrey L. Driscoll on behalf of International Concept Management, Inc.Attorney Jeffrey L. Driscoll added to party International Concept Management, Inc.(pty:dft) (Driscoll, Jeffrey)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/30/18. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
October 29, 2018 Filing 19 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rvill, )
October 29, 2018 Filing 18 Case assigned to Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
October 29, 2018 Filing 17 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rvill, )
October 29, 2018 Filing 16 Case transferred in from the Southern District of Texas; Case Number 4:18-cv-01109. File, transfer order and docket sheet received .
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/29/2018.]
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Jeffrey Driscoll to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/29/2018.]
October 4, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Jeffrey Driscoll to Appear Pro Hac Vice by International Concept Management, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/25/2018. (Brown, Gregg) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/29/2018.]
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan due by 11/28/2018. Initial Conference set for 12/3/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/29/2018.]
September 28, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint by International Concept Management, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Brown, Gregg) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/29/2018.]
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTED #8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and to Reschedule Initial Pretrial Conference ( Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan due by 10/15/2018., Initial Conference set for 10/18/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas)(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/29/2018.]
August 17, 2018 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER re: #8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and to Reschedule Initial Pretrial Conference, filed.(Brown, Gregg) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/29/2018.]
August 17, 2018 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and to Reschedule Initial Pretrial Conference by International Concept Management, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Joint Mtn for Extension of Time)(Brown, Gregg) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/29/2018.]
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan due by 9/18/2018. Initial Conference set for 9/24/2018 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/29/2018.]
July 17, 2018 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO #4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, filed by Ferguson Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Wertz, Barry) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/29/2018.]
July 10, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to International Concept Management, Inc. served on 6/28/2018, answer due 8/27/2018, filed.(Wertz, Barry) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/29/2018.]
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan due by 8/22/2018. Show Cause Response due by 7/19/2018 Initial Conference set for 8/27/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/29/2018.]
April 24, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Ferguson Enterprises, Inc., filed.(Wertz, Barry) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/29/2018.]
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/23/2018 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas. (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(olindoradi, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/29/2018.]
April 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against International Concept Management, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-19872603) filed by Ferguson Enterprises, Inc..(Wertz, Barry) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 10/29/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferguson Enterprises, Inc. v. International Concept Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Concept Management, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ferguson Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Lindsay Robertson
Represented By: Webster Cofield Cash, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?