Service Employees International Union Local 105 v. American Automation, Inc.
Plaintiff: Service Employees International Union Local 105
Defendant: American Automation, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02776
Filed: October 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:0185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Daniel Mitchell Combs on behalf of American Automation, Inc.Attorney Daniel Mitchell Combs added to party American Automation, Inc.(pty:dft) (Combs, Daniel)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 12/21/2018. American Automation, Inc. answer due 1/7/2019. (slibi, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Campbell, Stacey)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant American Automation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Campbell, Stacey)
December 10, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Service Employees International Union Local 105. American Automation, Inc. served on 12/3/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (Reinken, William)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 10/31/2018. Consent Form due by 1/3/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 1/17/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (tsher, )
October 30, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
October 30, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, ) Modified to correct filing date on 10/30/2018 (cmadr, )
October 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Compel Arbitration against American Automation, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6371439)Attorney William Richard Reinken added to party Service Employees International Union Local 105(pty:pla), filed by Service Employees International Union Local 105. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit A)(Reinken, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Service Employees International Union Local 105 v. American Automation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Service Employees International Union Local 105
Represented By: William Richard Reinken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Automation, Inc.
Represented By: Stacey Alan Campbell
Represented By: Daniel Mitchell Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?