Matrix Trust Company v. Caldwell and Partners, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Matrix Trust Company
Defendant: MIDLANDS MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, MIDLANDS CLAIM ADMINISTRATORS, INC., Charles C. Caldwell, MIDLANDS MANAGEMENT OF TEXAS, INC., CALDWELL AND PARTNERS, INC. and Dennis J. Ottis
Case Number: 1:2018cv02830
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING CONSENT/NONCONSENT FORM Scheduling Conference set for 2/20/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Consent Form due by 2/13/2019. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 11/28/18. (amont, )
November 27, 2018 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Matrix Trust Company. Midlands Management of Texas, Inc. waiver sent on 11/14/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (Carey, Michael)
November 27, 2018 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Matrix Trust Company. Midlands Management Corporation waiver sent on 11/14/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (Carey, Michael)
November 27, 2018 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Matrix Trust Company. Midlands Claim Administrators, Inc. waiver sent on 11/14/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (Carey, Michael)
November 27, 2018 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Matrix Trust Company. Dennis J. Ottis waiver sent on 11/14/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (Carey, Michael)
November 27, 2018 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Matrix Trust Company. Charles C. Caldwell waiver sent on 11/14/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (Carey, Michael)
November 27, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Matrix Trust Company. Caldwell and Partners, Inc. waiver sent on 11/14/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (Carey, Michael)
November 6, 2018 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rkeec)
November 6, 2018 Filing 8 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #7 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-02830-SKC. (Text Only Entry) (rkeec)
November 6, 2018 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. (rkeec)
November 6, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sarah Levine Hartley on behalf of Matrix Trust CompanyAttorney Sarah Levine Hartley added to party Matrix Trust Company(pty:pla) (Hartley, Sarah)
November 6, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael Peter Carey on behalf of Matrix Trust CompanyAttorney Michael Peter Carey added to party Matrix Trust Company(pty:pla) (Carey, Michael)
November 2, 2018 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (cmadr, )
November 2, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
November 2, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Broadridge Financial Solutions, Inc. for Matrix Trust Company. (Lewis, Robert)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT AND OTHER RELIEF against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6379165)Attorney Robert Arthur Lewis added to party Matrix Trust Company(pty:pla), filed by Matrix Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lewis, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matrix Trust Company v. Caldwell and Partners, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIDLANDS MANAGEMENT CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIDLANDS CLAIM ADMINISTRATORS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles C. Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIDLANDS MANAGEMENT OF TEXAS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CALDWELL AND PARTNERS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis J. Ottis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matrix Trust Company
Represented By: Robert Arthur Lewis
Represented By: Sarah Levine Hartley
Represented By: Michael Peter Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?