Noflin v. Two Rivers Drug Enforcement Team et al
Plaintiff: Wade Noflin
Defendant: Garfield County (Colorado) Board of Commissioners, Town of Silt, The, Garfield County Sheriff's Office, City of Glenwood Springs and Two Rivers Drug Enforcement Team
Case Number: 1:2018cv02841
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants City of Glenwood Springs, Town of Silt, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Williams, Joseph)
December 24, 2018 Filing 21 Exhibits by Plaintiff Wade Noflin. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jgonz, )
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER granting #18 Motion to Restrict Public Access to Exhibit D to Their Motion to Dismiss, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 12/17/2018. The Clerk is directed to place Dkt. #19 under Level 1 Restriction. (slibi, )
December 12, 2018 Filing 19 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Release and Settlement Agreement - Exhibit D to #17 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Garfield County (Colorado) Board of Commissioners, Garfield County Sheriff's Office, Two Rivers Drug Enforcement Team.. (Pratt, Katherine) Modified on 12/18/2018 to add public entry (tsher, ).
December 12, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Defendants Garfield County (Colorado) Board of Commissioners, Garfield County Sheriff's Office, Two Rivers Drug Enforcement Team. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Pratt, Katherine)
December 12, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(B)(1) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(B)(6) by Defendants Garfield County (Colorado) Board of Commissioners, Garfield County Sheriff's Office, Two Rivers Drug Enforcement Team. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C - Part 1 of 2, #4 Exhibit C - Part 2 of 2, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Pratt, Katherine)
December 11, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joseph David Williams on behalf of City of Glenwood Springs, Town of Silt, TheAttorney Joseph David Williams added to party City of Glenwood Springs(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph David Williams added to party Town of Silt, The(pty:dft) (Williams, Joseph)
December 11, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Eric Michael Ziporin on behalf of City of Glenwood Springs, Town of Silt, TheAttorney Eric Michael Ziporin added to party City of Glenwood Springs(pty:dft), Attorney Eric Michael Ziporin added to party Town of Silt, The(pty:dft) (Ziporin, Eric)
December 6, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Katherine M.L. Pratt on behalf of Two Rivers Drug Enforcement TeamAttorney Katherine M.L. Pratt added to party Two Rivers Drug Enforcement Team(pty:dft) (Pratt, Katherine)
December 6, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Cathy Havener Greer on behalf of Two Rivers Drug Enforcement TeamAttorney Cathy Havener Greer added to party Two Rivers Drug Enforcement Team(pty:dft) (Greer, Cathy)
December 6, 2018 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Two Rivers Drug Enforcement Team. Two Rivers Drug Enforcement Team waiver sent on 11/2/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Greer, Cathy)
December 5, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Katherine M.L. Pratt on behalf of Garfield County (Colorado) Board of Commissioners, Garfield County Sheriff's OfficeAttorney Katherine M.L. Pratt added to party Garfield County (Colorado) Board of Commissioners(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine M.L. Pratt added to party Garfield County Sheriff's Office(pty:dft) (Pratt, Katherine)
December 5, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Cathy Havener Greer on behalf of Garfield County (Colorado) Board of Commissioners, Garfield County Sheriff's OfficeAttorney Cathy Havener Greer added to party Garfield County (Colorado) Board of Commissioners(pty:dft), Attorney Cathy Havener Greer added to party Garfield County Sheriff's Office(pty:dft) (Greer, Cathy)
December 5, 2018 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Garfield County Sheriff's Office, Garfield County (Colorado) Board of Commissioners. Garfield County Sheriff's Office waiver sent on 11/2/2018, answer due 1/2/2019; Garfield County (Colorado) Board of Commissioners waiver sent on 11/2/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Greer, Cathy)
November 30, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service by Mail by Clerk of Court re #7 Minute Order to Wade Noflin PO Box 2 Winton, CA 95388. Text Only Entry. (tsher, )
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 11/30/2018. Consent Form due by 1/2/2019. Status Conference set for 1/16/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (tsher, )
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (evana, )
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DRAWING CASE by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/20/2018. This Case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-02841 NRN. (evana, )
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 PAYMENT RECEIVED from Wade Noflin in the amount of $ 50.00; Receipt Number COX087710; Monthly Payment. (evana, )
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency. Ordered that Plaintiff cure the designated deficiency by tendering to the court an additional payment in the amount of $50.00. This action will be dismissed without further notice if Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiency within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/7/2018. (agarc, )
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT & Jury Demand City of Glenwood Springs, Garfield County (Colorado) Board of Commissioners, Garfield County Sheriff's Office, Town of Silt, The, Two Rivers Drug Enforcement Team. Partial Filing Fee: $350.00; Receipt Number:COX087494, filed by Wade Noflin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(dbera, ) Modified to correct docket text on 11/6/2018 (dbera, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noflin v. Two Rivers Drug Enforcement Team et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garfield County (Colorado) Board of Commissioners
Represented By: Katherine M.L. Pratt
Represented By: Cathy Havener Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Silt, The
Represented By: Eric Michael Ziporin
Represented By: Joseph David Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garfield County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: Katherine M.L. Pratt
Represented By: Cathy Havener Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Glenwood Springs
Represented By: Eric Michael Ziporin
Represented By: Joseph David Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Two Rivers Drug Enforcement Team
Represented By: Katherine M.L. Pratt
Represented By: Cathy Havener Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wade Noflin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?