Tinnin v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Terrence Lee Tinnin
Defendant: Social Security Administration and Mark S Pestal
Case Number: 1:2018cv02869
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Raymond P Moore
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 24, 2018 Filing 16 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration and Mark S. Pestal, filed by Terrence Lee Tinnin.(cthom, )
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 12/13/2018. I respectfully RECOMMEND that The Amended Motion to Dismiss #12 be GRANTED; Any claim brought under 18 U.S.C. 1341 be DISMISSED with prejudice; Any claim brought under the RFPA be DISMISSED without prejudice, with leave to amend, utilizing the court-approved Complaint form, be permitted within 21 days of an Order by Judge Moore to cure the deficiencies identified in this Recommendation. (bwilk, )
November 30, 2018 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #12 Amended MOTION to Dismiss titled "Motion to stop dismissal of Case" filed by Plaintiff Terrence Lee Tinnin. (cthom, )
November 26, 2018 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM regarding #12 Amended MOTION to Dismiss filed by Social Security Administration. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 11/26/2018. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
November 26, 2018 Filing 12 Amended MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Social Security Administration. (Pestal, Mark)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER striking #10 Motion to Dismiss for failure to comply with Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards. Specifically, although the Local Rules do not require conferral, the Judge's Civil Practice Standards require a party to confer before filing a motion to dismiss. See Civil Practice Standard IV.M(2)(a). If, after meaningful conferral, refilling is appropriate, Defendant is granted leave to refile on or before November 29, 2018. Any refiled motion must contain a certificate of conferral. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 11/20/2018. (Text Only Entry ) (rmsec )
November 20, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Social Security Administration. (Pestal, Mark)
November 16, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE by Plaintiff Terrence Lee Tinnin (cthom, )
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: This matter is before the Court sua sponte upon consideration that, at the time of removal, there was a Denver County Small Claims Court trial setting. The parties are advised that the state court trial setting (November 13, 2018) is not controlling and trial, if necessary, will be set at a future date. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 11/7/2018. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: This matter is before the Court sua sponte upon review of this matter in which Plaintiff appears pro se. The Court strongly encourages Mr. Tinnin to contact the Federal Pro Se Clinic which provides free legal assistance to people representing themselves in the U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado. The Clinic cannot assist with criminal, bankruptcy, habeas, appeals, or any state cases. If Mr. Tinnin wishes to avail himself of this service, he may make an appointment by phone (303-380-8786) or online at www.cobar.org/cofederalproseclinic. The Clinic is located at: Alfred A. Arraj Courthouse (first floor), 901 19th Street, Denver, CO 80294. Walk-in appointments may also be available, but only on a space-available basis. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 11/7/2018. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 11/7/2018. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 11/7/2018. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
November 7, 2018 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rvill, )
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
November 7, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Claim and Summons to Appear For Trial against Social Security Administration, filed by Terrence Lee Tinnin.(rvill, )
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Social Security Administration from Small Claims Denver County Court, Case Number 2018S00859., filed by Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NOTICE, CLAIM, AND SUMMONS TO APPEAR FOR TRIAL, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Pestal, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tinnin v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence Lee Tinnin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Mark S. Pestal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark S Pestal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?