Nuckles v. Aspen National Financial, Inc.

Plaintiff: Dustin Nuckles
Defendant: Aspen National Financial, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02875
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Referring Judge: William J Martinez
2 Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER : Scheduling Conference set for 1/10/2019 10:30 AM in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. A Scheduling Conference is set in GRAND JUNCTION, Colorado at the Wayne Aspinall Federal Building - United States Courthouse, 400 Rood Avenue, Grand Junction, CO 81501 before U.S. Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. The parties shall comply with the Instructions to Scheduling Order for U.S. Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher which can be found at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Parties concerned regarding travel time and expense to Grand Junction for appearances before the Magistrate Judge are referred to this Magistrate Judge's policy in that regard which can be found at the above website. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on January 4, 2019. Text Only Entry (gpgsec, )
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER. In light of 19 Order reassigning this action to Magistrate Judge Gallagher as the referral judge, the Scheduling Conference set for 1/17/2019 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Varholak is VACATED. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 1/4/2019. Text Only Entry (stvlc2, )
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: This matter has its factual nexus in Delta County. According to the Court's Revised Jury Plan for Random Jury Selection, this case is therefore properly designated for Jury Division 3. Because the jury will be drawn from that Division, it is appropriate that the case be managed, for pretrial purposes, by Magistrate Judge Gallagher in Grand Junction. Accordingly, pursuant to D.C. Colo. L. Civ. R. 40.1(a), and as approved by the Chief Judge of the Court, the undersigned directs that the Clerk of the Court reassign this action to Magistrate Judge Gallagher as the referral judge. All further pleadings in this case shall reflect the case number of 18-cv-02875-WJM-GPG. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 1/4/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2018 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 1/ 2/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Magistrate Judge Varholak, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 1/2/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
January 2, 2019 Filing 16 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #15 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge William J. Martinez. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-02875-WJM. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
January 2, 2019 Filing 15 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Dustin Nuckles All parties do not consent.. (Badwan, Mohammed)
December 26, 2018 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Aspen National Financial, Inc..(Maurice, Donald)
December 4, 2018 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Maurice, Donald)
December 4, 2018 Filing 12 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint to 12/26/2018 by Defendant Aspen National Financial, Inc.. Aspen National Financial, Inc. answer due 12/26/2018. (Maurice, Donald)
December 4, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Donald S. Maurice, Jr on behalf of Aspen National Financial, Inc.Attorney Donald S. Maurice, Jr added to party Aspen National Financial, Inc.(pty:dft) (Maurice, Donald)
December 3, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dustin Nuckles. Aspen National Financial, Inc. served on 11/13/2018, answer due 12/4/2018. (Davidson, Joseph)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 11/9/18. Consent Form due by 1/3/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 1/17/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (nmarb, )
November 8, 2018 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rkeec)
November 8, 2018 Filing 7 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #6 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-02875-STV. (Text Only Entry) (rkeec)
November 8, 2018 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. (rkeec)
November 8, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
November 8, 2018 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mohammed Omar Badwan on behalf of Dustin NucklesAttorney Mohammed Omar Badwan added to party Dustin Nuckles(pty:pla) (Badwan, Mohammed)
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joseph Scott Davidson on behalf of Dustin Nuckles (Davidson, Joseph)
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aspen National Financial, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6386501)Attorney Joseph Scott Davidson added to party Dustin Nuckles(pty:pla), filed by Dustin Nuckles. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Davidson, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nuckles v. Aspen National Financial, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aspen National Financial, Inc.
Represented By: Donald S. Maurice, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Nuckles
Represented By: Mohammed Omar Badwan
Represented By: Joseph Scott Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?