Fusetti v. Paramount Equity Mortgage, LLC

Plaintiff: Chris Fusetti
Defendant: Paramount Equity Mortgage, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv02879
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
0 Judge: Marcia S Krieger
1 Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Filing 9 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Paramount Equity Mortgage, LLC.(Anderson, Derek)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/11/18. Scheduling Conference set for 2/14/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3) (lgale, )
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond Paramount Equity Mortgage, LLC answer due 12/17/2018. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 12/4/2018. Text Only Entry (msklc4, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Defendant Paramount Equity Mortgage, LLC. (Anderson, Derek)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chris Fusetti. Paramount Equity Mortgage, LLC served on 11/13/2018, answer due 12/4/2018. (Agruss, Michael)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix: IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and FED. R. CIV. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to:(1)Convene a scheduling conference under FED. R. CIV. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling Order, and resolve discovery matters;(2)ADR: Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. Early Neutral Evaluation is approved. On the informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in a settlement conference conducted by the magistrate judge if the parties have engaged in an Early Neutral Evaluation and are unable to afford or otherwise attain private settlement assistance;(3)Hear and determine referred matters in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B). by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 11/8/18. Text Only Entry (msklc2, )
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rroge, )
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Paramount Equity Mortgage, LLC d/b/a Loanpal (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6387464)Attorney Michael S. Agruss added to party Chris Fusetti(pty:pla), filed by Chris Fusetti. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Agruss, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fusetti v. Paramount Equity Mortgage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Equity Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: Derek C. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Fusetti
Represented By: Michael S. Agruss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?