Green v. Raemisch et al

Plaintiff: Joshua Hubert Green
Defendant: Mary Carlson, Rick Raemisch and Colorado Department of Corrections, The
Case Number: 1:2018cv02950
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mary Carlson, Rick Raemisch, Colorado Department of Corrections, The, filed by Joshua Hubert Green.(evana, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Joshua Hubert Green. (evana, )
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER Plaintiff filed a Motion for Extension of Time, ECF No. #4 .1 The Motion is granted. Plaintiff shall have thirty days from the date of this Minute Order to comply with the Order to Cure Deficiencies entered in ECF No. #3 . If Plaintiff fails to comply within the time allowed the action will be dismissed without further notice, By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/14/2018. (evana, )
December 11, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to Cure Deficiencies by Plaintiff Joshua Hubert Green. (evana, )
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES within thirty days from the date of this Order. Any papers that Plaintiff files in response to this Order must include the civil action number on this Order. That if Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty days from the date of this Order the action will be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/15/2018. (evana, )
November 15, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 Prisoner's Civil Rights COMPLAINT against Mary Carlson, Rick Raemisch, filed by Joshua Hubert Green.(rroge, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Raemisch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Raemisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Department of Corrections, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Hubert Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?