Costello v. Canvas Credit Union et al

Plaintiff: Brian Costello
Defendant: Canvas Credit Union and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02952
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: Colorado District Court
0 Judge: Wiley Y Daniel
1 Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order 17 MINUTE ORDER : When the parties did not consent to the exercise of magistrate judge jurisdiction, the matter was reassigned from the undersigned Magistrate Judge. As this case is no longer before Magistrate Judge Wang in any capacity, the Scheduling Conference set for 1.14.2019 before Magistrate Judge Wang was implicitly, and is now explicitly, VACATED. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 1.11.2019. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, )
January 7, 2019 16 NOTICE of Settlement with Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc by Plaintiff Brian Costello (Osborne, Matthew)
January 7, 2019 15 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Brian Costello. (Osborne, Matthew)
January 4, 2019 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Canvas Credit Union.(Metzger, Benjamin)
December 27, 2018 13 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #12 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel.All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-02952-WYD. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, )
December 20, 2018 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Brian Costello All parties do not consent.. (Osborne, Matthew)
December 14, 2018 11 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Canvas Credit Union.. (Metzger, Benjamin)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order 10 MINUTE ORDER : D.C.COLO.LCivR 6.1(c) requires that "a stipulation or motion for extension of time" must "be served contemporaneously by counsel on his or her client." The recently filed Stipulation #8 did not contain an attestation of compliance with this Rule. Further non-compliance with Rule 6.1(c) may result in the court striking the requested relief without substantive consideration. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 12.14.2018. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, )
December 14, 2018 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Donna Woo on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc.Attorney Donna Woo added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft) (Woo, Donna)
December 14, 2018 8 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Canvas Credit Union. Canvas Credit Union answer due 1/4/2019. (Metzger, Benjamin)
December 14, 2018 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Benjamin Paul Metzger on behalf of Canvas Credit UnionAttorney Benjamin Paul Metzger added to party Canvas Credit Union(pty:dft) (Metzger, Benjamin)
December 12, 2018 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Online Date Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Service LLC, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Averbach, Robyn)
December 12, 2018 5 Defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Attorney Robyn Berger Averbach added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft) by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Averbach, Robyn)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order 4 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NONCONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 11/16/2018. A Scheduling Conference is set for 1/14/2019 01:00 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The parties shall submit their proposed scheduling order, including a copy of the proposed order in Word format sent via email to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 1/7/2019. The parties shall complete and file the Consent/Nonconsent Form by 12/31/2018. (bwilk, )
November 16, 2018 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rroge, )
November 16, 2018 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
November 16, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Canvas Credit Union, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6398845)Attorney Matthew Ross Osborne added to party Brian Costello(pty:pla), filed by Brian Costello. (Attachments: #1 Summons Proposed Summons Canvas, #2 Summons Proposed Summons Experian)(Osborne, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Costello v. Canvas Credit Union et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canvas Credit Union
Represented By: Benjamin Paul Metzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Donna Woo
Represented By: Robyn Berger Averbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Costello
Represented By: Matthew Ross Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?