In Re: Robert E. Wright et al

Interested Party: United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado and U.S. Trustee
Appellant: Carla S. Wright and Robert E. Wright
Appellee: Beauvallon Condominium Association, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02954
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF DISMISSAL UNDER FED. R. BANKR. P. 8023. The Appellants' Unopposed Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal [#16 ] is granted. This appeal is dismissed. As agreed by the parties, dismissal of this appeal is expressly without prejudice to any award of fees, as such fees are not permitted by the terms of the relevant condominium declarations. The parties shall bear their own costs. This case is closed. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 01/09/2019. (athom, )
December 28, 2018 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Appeal by Appellants Carla S. Wright, Robert E. Wright. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Vellone, Patrick)
December 27, 2018 Filing 15 SUPPLEMENT to #11 BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL by Appellee Beauvallon Condominium Association, Inc. pursuant to #14 Minute Order. (athom, )
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/27/2018. The Motion of Appellee Beauvallon Condominium Association, Inc. To Supplement Record On Appeal [#12 ] is granted. The record on appeal shall be supplemented with the Finding of Facts, Conclusions of Law, and Judgment of the District Court for the City and County of Denver, State of Colorado in Wright v. Beauvallon Condominium Association, Inc., Case No. 2018CV30145, dated December 20, 2018. (athom, )
December 27, 2018 Filing 13 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #12 MOTION to Supplement record filed by attorney Aaron A. Garber. The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (athom, )
December 26, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Supplement record by Appellee Beauvallon Condominium Association, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Order granting motion to supplement record)(Garber, Aaron)
December 19, 2018 Filing 11 BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL. Number of Volumes: 2. (Attachments: #1 Volume I, #2 Volume II, #3 Docket No. 471 Amended Designation of Record, #4 Attachements to Docket No. 471: 471-1 to 471-5, #5 Docket No. 497 Order Denying Motion to Supplement) (athom, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 10 DESIGNATION of Record and Statement of Issues by Appellants Carla S. Wright, Robert E. Wright re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Issues on Appeal) (athom, )
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/13/2018. The Joint Motion for Continuance of Briefing Schedule Pending Judgment of State Court [#8 ] is granted. The appellants shall file their opening brief within 30 days after the date judgment is entered in Denver County District Court Case No. 2018CV30145. After the appellants file their opening brief, the deadlines stated in Bankruptcy Rule 8018 shall apply. The parties shall file a brief status report on 3/15/2019, if judgment has not entered in Denver County District Court Case No. 2018cv30145 before that date. (athom, )
December 11, 2018 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Continue Briefing Schedule Pending Judgment of State Court by Appellants Carla S. Wright, Robert E. Wright. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Vellone, Patrick)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Establishing Bankruptcy Appeal Briefing Requirements re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, filed by Robert E. Wright, Carla S. Wright. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/16/2018. (athom, )
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Denying Debtor's Motion to Amend or Make Additional Findings Under Rule 7052, to Alter or Amend the Judgment Under Rule 9023, or Alternatively, for Relief Under Rule 9024 by U.S. Bankruptcy Judge Thomas B. McNamara on November 2, 2018. (cmadr, )
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion for Allowance of Administrative Claim Filed by Beauvallon Condominium Association, Inc. by U.S. Bankruptcy Judge Thomas B. McNamara on September 17, 2018. (cmadr, )
November 16, 2018 Filing 4 CASE OPENING. The above captioned case was opened on 16 November, 2018 and assigned the case number referenced above. After docketing of the record on appeal from the U.S. Bankruptcy Court, briefing will proceed in accordance with Bankruptcy Rules 8014, 8015, and 8018, and any orders of the court. When referencing trial exhibits you must attach copies to your brief. If the court finds it necessary to have the originals presented it will issue an order. All filings with the United States District Court, unless otherwise permitted by our Electronic Case Filing Procedures, must be done electronically. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 LETTER re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, (cmadr, )
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL and Statement of Election FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT by Appellants Carla S. Wright, Robert E. Wright in re: Order Granting Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion for Allowance of Administrative Claim Filed by Beauvallon Condominium Association, and Order Denying Reconsideration of the Same of 17 Sept. 2018, and 2 Nov. 2018. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(cmadr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Robert E. Wright et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: U.S. Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Carla S. Wright
Represented By: Patrick D. Vellone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Robert E. Wright
Represented By: Patrick D. Vellone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Beauvallon Condominium Association, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron A. Garber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?