USA v. 1281 Riley Way, Chaparral, New Mexico

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: 1281 Riley Way, Chaparral, New Mexico
Case Number: 1:2018cv02958
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
0 Judge: Michael E Hegarty
1 Judge: Raymond P Moore
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER granting #19 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time Due to Lapse in Congressional Appropriations by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 01/10/2019. Status Report due by 1/30/2019. (mdave, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM regarding #19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Status Report filed by USA. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/10/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec)
January 10, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Status Report by Plaintiff USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Andrews, Tonya)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Unrestrict Document by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/10/2019. #3 Government's Verified Complaint for Forfeiture in Rem and #13 MOTION for Leave to Restrict are hereby unrestricted. (tsher, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM regarding #16 MOTION to Unrestrict Document #3 Restricted Document - Level 2 filed by USA filed by USA. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/7/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
January 7, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Unrestrict Document #3 Restricted Document - Level 2 filed by USA by Plaintiff USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Andrews, Tonya)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Restrict By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/18/2018. The Clerk of Court is directed to maintain the documents located at ECF Nos. #12 and #13 under Restriction Level 2 until further order of the Court. (tsher, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM regarding #13 MOTION for Leave to Restrict filed by USA. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 12/14/2018. Text Only Entry (cpear)
December 14, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Plaintiff USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Andrews, Tonya)
December 14, 2018 Filing 12 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 2: by Plaintiff USA.. (Andrews, Tonya)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Restrict by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/16/2018. (tsher, )
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/16/2018. Status Report due by 12/15/2018. (tsher, )
November 16, 2018 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM regarding #2 MOTION for Leave to Restrict filed by USA. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 11/16/2018. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 11/16/2018. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 11/16/2018. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
November 16, 2018 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rvill, )
November 16, 2018 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
November 16, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Lis Pendens 1281 Riley Way by Plaintiff USA (Andrews, Tonya)
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 Verified Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem by Plaintiff USA.. (Andrews, Tonya) Modified on 1/10/2019 to unrestrict pursuant to #18 Order (tsher, ).
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Plaintiff USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Andrews, Tonya)
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against 1281 Riley Way, Chaparral, New Mexico Attorney Tonya Shotwell Andrews added to party USA(pty:pla), filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Andrews, Tonya)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. 1281 Riley Way, Chaparral, New Mexico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Tonya Shotwell Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1281 Riley Way, Chaparral, New Mexico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?