Jones v. Citizens Financial Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Donald T. Jones
Defendant: Citizens Financial Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02985
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Referring Judge: William J Martinez
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 Filing 13 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to #12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case filed in this case. Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
December 18, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff Donald T. Jones (Volheim, Nathan)
December 12, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald T. Jones. Citizens Financial Group, Inc. served on 12/6/2018, answer due 12/27/2018. (Volheim, Nathan)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/04/2018. Dismissal Paper due by 2/5/2019.The Scheduling Conference set for 1/29/2019 is vacated. (mdave, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Settlement by Plaintiff Donald T. Jones (Volheim, Nathan)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/27/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 1/29/2019 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2017 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 11 /26/2018. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Magistrate Judge Hegarty, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned to this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). ALSO ORDERED that unless service has otherwise been completed or arranged, Plaintiff's counsel is directed to effect service of the summons and complaint pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure no later than 30 days from the date of this Referral Order, in order for the initial scheduling conference to be held promptly. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 11/26/2018. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
November 20, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rroge, )
November 20, 2018 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge William J. Martinez and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
November 20, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Taxiarchis Hatzidimitriadis on behalf of Donald T. JonesAttorney Taxiarchis Hatzidimitriadis added to party Donald T. Jones(pty:pla) (Hatzidimitriadis, Taxiarchis)
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nathan Charles Volheim on behalf of Donald T. Jones (Volheim, Nathan)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Citizens Financial Group, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6404346)Attorney Nathan Charles Volheim added to party Donald T. Jones(pty:pla), filed by Donald T. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Volheim, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Citizens Financial Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizens Financial Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald T. Jones
Represented By: Taxiarchis Hatzidimitriadis
Represented By: Nathan Charles Volheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?