Lexington Insurance Company et al v. Alliance Construction Solutions LLC et al
Plaintiff: ACE American Insurance Company, Interested Underwriters, Lexington Insurance Company and First Specialty
Defendant: RK Mechanical, Inc. and Alliance Construction Solutions LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv03020
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time. Scheduling Conference set for 2.06.2019 is RESET for 2/25/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Consent Form deadline 2/11; Proposed Scheduling Order due 2/18. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, )
January 23, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Upcoming Deadlines by Plaintiffs ACE American Insurance Company, First Specialty, Interested Underwriters, Lexington Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(O'Brian Williams, Geri)
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Alliance Construction Solutions LLC served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (O'Brien, Sean)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. RK Mechanical, Inc. served on 1/14/2019, answer due 2/4/2019. (O'Brien, Sean)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 12/3/18. Consent Form due by 1/23/2019. Scheduling and Planning Conference set for 2/6/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
November 26, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (dbera, )
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6410141)Attorney Geri Ann O'Brian Williams added to party ACE American Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney Geri Ann O'Brian Williams added to party First Specialty Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney Geri Ann O'Brian Williams added to party Interested Underwriters(pty:pla), Attorney Geri Ann O'Brian Williams added to party Lexington Insurance Company(pty:pla), filed by Lexington Insurance Company, First Specialty Insurance Company, Interested Underwriters, ACE American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(O'Brian Williams, Geri)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lexington Insurance Company et al v. Alliance Construction Solutions LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ACE American Insurance Company
Represented By: Benjamin Joseph Migliorino
Represented By: Geri Ann O'Brian Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Interested Underwriters
Represented By: Benjamin Joseph Migliorino
Represented By: Geri Ann O'Brian Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: Benjamin Joseph Migliorino
Represented By: Geri Ann O'Brian Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Specialty
Represented By: Benjamin Joseph Migliorino
Represented By: Geri Ann O'Brian Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RK Mechanical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliance Construction Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?