Brown v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Plaintiff: Donte Brown
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation and National Railroad Passenger Corporation doing business as Amtrak
Case Number: 1:2018cv03030
Filed: November 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Richard P Matsch
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1349
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/31/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 8/28/2019.Entered by Senior Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/22/2019. (lrobe)
January 22, 2019 Filing 16 COURTROOM MINUTES for Scheduling Conference held before Senior Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/22/2019. FTR: Kathy Terasaki. (lrobe)
January 18, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Donte Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Minamizono, Susan)
January 16, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Donte Brown All parties do not consent.. (Minamizono, Susan)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE A scheduling conference will be held on January 22, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. in the Conference Room, Second Floor, the Byron White United States Courthouse, 1823 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. The proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 12:00 noon on January 14, 2019. The conference is conducted with lead counsel present in person. No parties or representatives of parties will be permitted to attend, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/4/2019. (ktera)
December 28, 2018 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Carafelli, Andrew)
December 12, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Bradley Aaron Levin on behalf of Donte BrownAttorney Bradley Aaron Levin added to party Donte Brown(pty:pla) (Levin, Bradley)
December 6, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance [Amended] by Andrew James Carafelli on behalf of National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Carafelli, Andrew)
December 4, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew James Carafelli on behalf of National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Carafelli, Andrew)
November 28, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Susan S. Minamizono on behalf of Donte BrownAttorney Susan S. Minamizono added to party Donte Brown(pty:pla) (Minamizono, Susan)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PROCEDURAL ORDER NUMBER ONE Counsel will meet and confer as required by Rule 26 (f)(2) within 30 days from the date of this order. Lead counsel shall attend the conference in person. The disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1)(A) shall be made within 14 days after that conference. Counsel for the plaintiff will telephone chambers [303-844-4627] within 10 days after the disclosures to set a date and time for a Scheduling Conference pursuant to Rule 16. The instructions for preparation of the Scheduling Order and the form of that order are found at http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/judges/judges.aspx, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/27/2018. (ktera)
November 27, 2018 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rvill, )
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Richard P. Matsch and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
November 27, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by National Railroad Passenger Corporation.(Carafelli, Andrew)
November 27, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against National Railroad Passenger Corporation, filed by Donte Brown.(rvill, )
November 27, 2018 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rvill, )
November 27, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by National Railroad Passenger Corporation (d/b/a/ AMTRAK) from Denver County District Court, Case Number 2018cv34157. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6412071), filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation (d/b/a/ AMTRAK). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Carafelli, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: Andrew James Carafelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation doing business as Amtrak
Represented By: Andrew James Carafelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donte Brown
Represented By: Bradley Aaron Levin
Represented By: Susan S. Minamizono
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?