Rocky Mountain Wild, Inc. v. United States Forest Service et al
Plaintiff: Rocky Mountain Wild, Inc.
Defendant: United States Forest Service and United States Department of Agriculture
Case Number: 1:2018cv03065
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/14/2019 granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time and to Vacate and Reset Scheduling Conference Due to Lapse in Appropriations. United States Department of Agriculture answer due 1/31/2019; United States Forest Service answer due 1/31/2019. Scheduling Conference is VACATED and RESET to 2/21/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to Vacate and Reset Scheduling Conference by Defendants United States Department of Agriculture, United States Forest Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Bobet, Jane)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER granting #6 Defendants Motion for Extension of Time Due to Lapse inCongressional Appropriations by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/27/2018. United States Department of Agriculture answer due 1/17/2019; United States Forest Service answer due 1/17/2019. (mdave, )
December 26, 2018 Filing 6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendants United States Department of Agriculture, United States Forest Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Bobet, Jane)
December 26, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jane Elizabeth Bobet on behalf of United States Department of Agriculture, United States Forest ServiceAttorney Jane Elizabeth Bobet added to party United States Department of Agriculture(pty:dft), Attorney Jane Elizabeth Bobet added to party United States Forest Service(pty:dft) (Bobet, Jane)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/30/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 1/31/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (mdave, )
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (dbera, )
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Department of Agriculture, United States Forest Service (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6417150)Attorney Matthew David Sandler added to party Rocky Mountain Wild, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Rocky Mountain Wild, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Related Case, #3 Exhibit 1_July 20, 2018 FOIA Request, #4 Exhibit 2_August 7, 2018 Letter, #5 Exhibit 3_August 16, 2018 Response, #6 Exhibit 4_September 5, 2018 Reply Letters, #7 Summons Forest Service, #8 Summons Dept of Agriculture, #9 Summons US Attorney, #10 Summons US Attorney General)(Sandler, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rocky Mountain Wild, Inc. v. United States Forest Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Represented By: Jane Elizabeth Bobet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture
Represented By: Jane Elizabeth Bobet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocky Mountain Wild, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew David Sandler
Represented By: Travis Earl Stills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?