Safeco Insurance Company of America v. Vail Corporation, The
Plaintiff: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Vail Resorts, Inc. and Vail Corporation, The
Case Number: 1:2018cv03068
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Richard P Matsch
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Vail Corporation, The. Vail Corporation, The answer due 2/6/2019. (Walker, Edward)
January 3, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safeco Insurance Company of America. Vail Corporation, The served on 12/21/2018, answer due 1/11/2019. (O'Brian Williams, Geri)
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Vail Resorts, Inc., filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America.(O'Brian Williams, Geri)
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (dbera, )
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Richard P. Matsch and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Vail Resorts, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6417533)Attorney Geri Ann O'Brian Williams added to party Safeco Insurance Company of America(pty:pla), filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(O'Brian Williams, Geri)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Safeco Insurance Company of America v. Vail Corporation, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Geri Ann O'Brian Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vail Resorts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vail Corporation, The
Represented By: Edward Timothy Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?