CSM Corporation v. Coolidge

Petitioner: CSM Corporation
Respondent: Michael Coolidge
Case Number: 1:2018cv03107
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 9:9
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER of Dismissal. Plaintiff's Notice of Withdrawal of Application To Confirm Arbitration Award [#7 ] is approved. Plaintiff's claims against defendant in this action are dismissed with prejudice. This case is closed. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 01/03/2019. (athom, )
December 31, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE re #1 Petition/Application, Withdrawal of Application to Confirm Arbitration Award by Petitioner CSM Corporation (Hennen, Todd)
December 5, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service re #1 Petition/Application, by Petitioner CSM Corporation. (Hennen, Todd)
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Todd L. Hennen on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hennen, Todd)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, further that the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of Judge Blackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred, subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referred as defined in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/3/18. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rvill, )
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Confirm Arbitration Award (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6421040)Attorney Todd L. Hennen added to party CSM Corporation(pty:pet), filed by CSM Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Todd L. Hennen with Attachments, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hennen, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CSM Corporation v. Coolidge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CSM Corporation
Represented By: Todd L. Hennen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael Coolidge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?