Reyes et al v. Larimer County Planning Commission, The et al
Plaintiff: Pedro Reyes and Teresita Reyes
Defendant: Jeff Jensen, Larimer County Planning Commission, The and Gary Gerrard
Case Number: 1:2018cv03115
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER. On January 25, 2019, Plaintiffs filed a "Motion to File Amended Complaint." (ECF No. #16 ). The motion is denied, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 1/29/2019. (angar, )
January 25, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to file Amended Complaint, by Plaintiffs Pedro Reyes, Teresita Reyes. (angar, )
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Directing Plaintiffs to File Amended Complaint. if Plaintiffs fail to file an amended Complaint that complies with this Order within the time allowed, the action may be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 1/14/2019. (angar, )
December 24, 2018 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Gary Gerrard, Jeff Jensen, Larimer County Planning Commission, The, filed by Pedro Reyes, Teresita Reyes.(evana, )
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER that the Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) filed by Plaintiff Pedro Reyes (ECF No. #7 ) is GRANTED. That the Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) filed by Plaintiff Teresita Reyes (ECF No. #9 ) is GRANTED. That the Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (ECF No. #3 ), the Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 (ECF No. #6 ), and the Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 (ECF No. #8 ) are DENIED as moot, By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/19/2018. (evana, )
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER On December 13, 2018, Plaintiffs filed a "Motion to Amend Complaint" on a form which is not this Court's form. (ECF No. #10 ). The "Motion to Amend Complaint" (ECF No. #5 ) is DENIED as it does not comply with the December 10, 2018, order. Plaintiffs shall file a cured Complaint as set forth in the Court's December 10 order within 30 days from the date of this minute order. If Plaintiffs fail to file a cured Complaint within the time allowed, this action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/18/2018. (evana, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 11 Conventionally Submitted Material : (1) CD Containing Exhibit 2 to #10 MOTION to Amend Complaint by Plaintiffs Pedro Reyes, and Teresita Reyes. Text Only Entry. (agarc, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Amend Complaint by Plaintiffs Pedro Reyes, and Teresita Reyes. (agarc, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 9 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs by Plaintiff Teresita Reyes. (agarc, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 8 Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 by Plaintiff Teresita Reyes. (agarc, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 7 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs by Plaintiff Pedro Reyes. (agarc, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 6 Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 by Plaintiff Pedro Reyes. (agarc, )
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO CURE DEFICIENCIES within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Any papers that Plaintiffs file in response to this order must include the civil action number on this order. that, if Plaintiffs fail to cure the designated deficiency within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/10/2018. (evana, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiffs Pedro Reyes, Teresita Reyes. (rroge, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 3 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiffs Pedro Reyes, Teresita Reyes. (rroge, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gary Gerrard, Jeff Jensen, Larimer County Planning Commission, The, filed by Pedro Reyes, Teresita Reyes.(rroge, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reyes et al v. Larimer County Planning Commission, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larimer County Planning Commission, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Gerrard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresita Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?