Rojo-Ramirez v. Trump et al
Plaintiff: Carlos Rojo-Ramirez
Defendant: Rod Rosenstein, Mary Beth Keller, Matthew Whitaker, James McHenry, Donald J. Trump, Rod J. Rosenstein and Matthew G. Whitaker
Case Number: 1:2018cv03125
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201an
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendants Mary Beth Keller, James McHenry, Rod J. Rosenstein, Donald J. Trump, Matthew G. Whitaker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Proposed Order)(York, Thomas)
February 1, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear by Defendants Mary Beth Keller, James McHenry, Rod J. Rosenstein, Donald J. Trump, Matthew G. Whitaker. (York, Thomas)
January 4, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) All Defendants. (Casey, Jennifer)
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued by Clerk as to Rod J. Rosenstein (jgonz, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (tsher, )
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/5/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 2/26/2019 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (mdave, )
December 5, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS REQUEST as to DONALD J TRUMP, et. al by Plaintiff Carlos Rojo-Ramirez. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons Request Matthew Whitaker, #2 Summons Summons Request Rod Rosenstein, #3 Summons Summons Request James McHenry, #4 Summons Summons Request Mary Beth Keller, #5 Summons Summons Request Jason Dunn)(Kolko, David)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rvill, )
December 5, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6424019)Attorney Jennifer Rilen Casey added to party Carlos Rojo-Ramirez(pty:pla), filed by Carlos Rojo-Ramirez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Casey, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rojo-Ramirez v. Trump et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rod Rosenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Beth Keller
Represented By: Thomas Benton York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James McHenry
Represented By: Thomas Benton York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J. Trump
Represented By: Thomas Benton York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rod J. Rosenstein
Represented By: Thomas Benton York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew G. Whitaker
Represented By: Thomas Benton York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Rojo-Ramirez
Represented By: Jennifer Rilen Casey
Represented By: David Lawrence Kolko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?