Tennyson v. Colorado DOC Time and Release Operations
Petitioner: Audrey L. Tennyson
Respondent: Colorado DOC Time and Release Operations
Case Number: 1:2018cv03157
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241st
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 JUDGMENT by Clerk re: #4 Order of Dismissal on 1/23/2019. (angar, )
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of Dismissal. Leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to the filing of a motion seeking leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal in the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 1/23/2019. (angar, )
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING APPLICANT TO CURE DEFICIENCIES within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Any papers that Applicant files in response to this Order must be labeled with the civil action number identified on this Order. That if Applicant fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/10/2018. (evana, )
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 LETTER to the District Court Judge for the Federal District of Colo. by Petitioner Audrey L. Tennyson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dbera, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tennyson v. Colorado DOC Time and Release Operations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Audrey L. Tennyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Colorado DOC Time and Release Operations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?