International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local 113 v. T & H Services

Petitioner: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local 113
Respondent: T & H Services
Case Number: 1:2018cv03159
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:4
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by T & H Services. T & H Services waiver sent on 1/7/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Johnson, Terrence)
January 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Micah David Dawson on behalf of T & H ServicesAttorney Micah David Dawson added to party T & H Services(pty:res) (Dawson, Micah)
January 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Todd Arthur Fredrickson on behalf of T & H ServicesAttorney Todd Arthur Fredrickson added to party T & H Services(pty:res) (Fredrickson, Todd)
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (evana, )
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS REQUEST as to T & H Services by Petitioner International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local 113. (Johnson, Terrence)
December 13, 2018 Filing 5 Administrative Notice re: #4 Summons attached is blank and is NOT issued. (Text Only Entry) (agarc, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS REQUEST as to T & H Services by Petitioner International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local 113. (Johnson, Terrence)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (rroge, )
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION PURSUANT TO SECTION 4 OF THE FEDERAL ARBITRATION ACT (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6431750)Attorney Terrence Adrian Johnson added to party International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local 113(pty:pet), filed by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local 113. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1, Collective Bargaining Agreement, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2, Grievance, #4 Exhibit Ex. 3, Letter from Fredrickson to Johnson of 11/5/18)(Johnson, Terrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local 113 v. T & H Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: T & H Services
Represented By: Todd Arthur Fredrickson
Represented By: Micah David Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local 113
Represented By: Terrence Adrian Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?