Sichenko v. Lambrecht et al
Plaintiff: Mr. Vasyl Sichenko and Vasyl Sichenko
Defendant: ANDREW LAMBRECHT, Department of Homeland Security, The, Secretary KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, Department of Homeland Security Citizenship & Immigration Service, LEE CISSNA, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Untied States Department of Homeland Security, Kirstjen Nielsen and L. Francis Cissna
Case Number: 1:2018cv03181
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Filing 17 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Vasyl Sichenko All parties consent.. (McIntyre, Charles)
January 29, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Timothy Bart Jafek on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Timothy Bart Jafek added to party L. Francis Cissna(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy Bart Jafek added to party Andrew Lambrecht(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy Bart Jafek added to party Kirstjen Nielsen(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy Bart Jafek added to party United States Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy Bart Jafek added to party Untied States Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft) (Jafek, Timothy)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 01/17/19, Setting Deadline for Filing Election Concerning Consent or Non-Consent to Magistrate Jurisdiction Form and Setting Scheduling Conference. Consent Form due by 3/20/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 4/3/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (nmarb, )
January 17, 2019 Filing 14 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (evana, )
January 17, 2019 Filing 13 CASE REASSIGNED. Pursuant to #12 Order Reassigning Case, Your AP case is at issue. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1 this case is randomly reassigned Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-03181 STV. (Text Only Entry) (evana, )
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DIRECTING REASSIGNMENT. I find and conclude that the claims of the plaintiff can be resolved more efficiently if this case is removed from the AP docket and drawn immediately to a merits judge. Under D.C.COLO.LAPR 16.1(c), I may terminate the designation of a case as an AP case for good cause. Good cause exists here. Termination of the AP designation of this case will ensure that all of the claims asserted in the complaint #2 are managed together and will ensure "the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination" of this case. Fed. R. Civ. P. 1. Thus, I order that this case be removed from the AP docket and be randomly drawn to a merits judge. THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED that the clerk of the court shall assign this case to a judge for resolution on the merits under the random assignment procedure of D.C.COLO.LCiv.R 40.1., by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 1/17/2019. (evana, )
January 2, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) Andrew Lambrecht served on 12/20/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Mail)(McIntyre, Charles)
January 2, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) L. Francis Cissna served on 12/20/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Mail)(McIntyre, Charles)
January 2, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) Kirstjen Nielsen served on 12/20/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Mail)(McIntyre, Charles)
January 2, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 12/20/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Personal)(McIntyre, Charles)
January 2, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) Untied States Department of Homeland Security served on 12/20/2018, answer due 2/25/2019. (McIntyre, Charles)
January 2, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) Untied States Department of Homeland Security served on 12/26/2018, answer due 2/25/2019. (McIntyre, Charles)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INSTRUCTIONS FOR JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN By Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/17/2018. (evana, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rroge, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against LEE CISSNA, Department of Homeland Security Citizenship & Immigration Service, Department of Homeland Security, The, ANDREW LAMBRECHT, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6437987)Attorney Charles Stafford McIntyre, IV added to party Vasyl Sichenko(pty:pla), filed by Vasyl Sichenko. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons Cissna, #9 Summons DHS, #10 Summons Lambrecht, #11 Summons Nielsen, #12 Summons USCIS)(McIntyre, Charles)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 Administrative Notice: No initiating document. Attorney contacted with instructions to file the initiating document within 24 hours. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sichenko v. Lambrecht et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW LAMBRECHT
Represented By: Timothy Bart Jafek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary KIRSTJEN NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security Citizenship & Immigration Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEE CISSNA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Timothy Bart Jafek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Untied States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Timothy Bart Jafek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: Timothy Bart Jafek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Francis Cissna
Represented By: Timothy Bart Jafek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Vasyl Sichenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vasyl Sichenko
Represented By: Charles Stafford McIntyre, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?