Nelson v. Wells Fargo & Company Short-Term Disability Plan
Plaintiff: Michelle Nelson
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company Short-Term Disability Plan
Case Number: 1:2018cv03183
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SECOND AMENDED ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 3/25/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 3/18/2019. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 02/06/2019. (ksena)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER granting #14 Motion to Allow Telephonic Participation at Scheduling Conference. Plaintiff's counsel may attend the Scheduling Conference by telephone by calling 719-575-0328 at the scheduled time. Counsel shall use a LAND LINE; NO CELLULAR, CORDLESS OR SPEAKER PHONES ARE PERMITTED. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/5/19. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 )
February 4, 2019 Filing 14 Stipulated MOTION for Leave to Allow Telephonic Participation at Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Michelle Nelson. (Krieger, Michael)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER granting #12 Motion to Vacate and Reset Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference set for 2/11/2019 is vacated, to be reset by separate order. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/4/19. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 )
February 4, 2019 Filing 12 Stipulated MOTION to Vacate and Reschedule Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Michelle Nelson. (Krieger, Michael)
January 29, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Wells Fargo & Company Short-Term Disability Plan. Wells Fargo & Company Short-Term Disability Plan answer due 2/19/2019. (Caminiti, Kathleen)
January 29, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kathleen McLeod Caminiti on behalf of Wells Fargo & Company Short-Term Disability PlanAttorney Kathleen McLeod Caminiti added to party Wells Fargo & Company Short-Term Disability Plan(pty:dft) (Caminiti, Kathleen)
January 16, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michelle Nelson. Wells Fargo & Company Short-Term Disability Plan served on 1/8/2019, answer due 1/29/2019. (Krieger, Michael)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 2/11/2019 at 09:15 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/20/2018. (ksena)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER granting #6 Motion to Vacate Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference will be reset by separate order. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/20/18. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 )
December 19, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Vacate and Reset Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Michelle Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Krieger, Michael)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 2/11/2019 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 2/4/2019. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/18/2018. (ksena)
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (dbera, )
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
December 12, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Wells Fargo & Company Short-Term Disability Plan re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Michelle Nelson. (Krieger, Michael)
December 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo & Company Short-Term Disability Plan (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6437283)Attorney Michael Scott Krieger added to party Michelle Nelson(pty:pla), filed by Michelle Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Krieger, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Wells Fargo & Company Short-Term Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company Short-Term Disability Plan
Represented By: Kathleen McLeod Caminiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Nelson
Represented By: Michael Scott Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?