Mindock et al v. Bruff Dumars et al
Plaintiff: David Mindock and Aspen Glade, Ltd.
Defendant: Christina J. Bruff Dumars and Matthew J Bruff
Case Number: 1:2018cv03240
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE to #21 MOTION to Strike #17 Response to Motion, #19 Response to Motion, filed by Plaintiffs Aspen Glade, Ltd., David Mindock. (Gregory, Robert)
February 1, 2019 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to #12 MOTION to Dismiss Party to Dismiss Defendant Matthew J. Bruff, or Alternatively, Re-align Defendant Matthew J. Bruff as a Party Plaintiff Due to Fraudulent Joinder Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 21 filed by Defendant Christina J. Bruff Dumars. (Daniel, Lacy)
February 1, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE to #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Defendant Christina J. Bruff Dumars. (Daniel, Lacy)
February 1, 2019 Filing 25 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Christina J. Bruff Dumars All parties do not consent.. (Daniel, Lacy)
January 30, 2019 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Due to Lack of Standing and for Failure to State a Claim Due to Expiration of the Applicable Statute of Limitations filed by Defendant Christina J. Bruff Dumars. (Daniel, Lacy)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER: A Scheduling Conference is set for 3/28/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 1/29/19. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
January 23, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to #14 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Defendant Christina J. Bruff Dumars. (Daniel, Lacy)
January 23, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Strike #17 Response to Motion, #19 Response to Motion, by Defendant Christina J. Bruff Dumars. (Daniel, Lacy)
January 22, 2019 Filing 20 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #19 Response to Motion, filed by attorney Robert N. Gregory.The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (dkals, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE to #12 MOTION to Dismiss Party to Dismiss Defendant Matthew J. Bruff, or Alternatively, Re-align Defendant Matthew J. Bruff as a Party Plaintiff Due to Fraudulent Joinder Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 21 filed by Plaintiffs Aspen Glade, Ltd., David Mindock. (Gregory, Robert)
January 17, 2019 Filing 18 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #17 Response to Motion, filed by attorney Robert N. Gregory.The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (dkals, )
January 16, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE to #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Due to Lack of Standing and for Failure to State a Claim Due to Expiration of the Applicable Statute of Limitations filed by Plaintiff David Mindock. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to Response to Motion to Dismiss)(Gregory, Robert)
January 14, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to #14 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Plaintiffs Aspen Glade, Ltd., David Mindock. (Gregory, Robert)
January 14, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs Aspen Glade, Ltd., David Mindock. (Gregory, Robert)
January 14, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Defendant Christina J. Bruff Dumars. (Daniel, Lacy)
December 19, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Due to Lack of Standing and for Failure to State a Claim Due to Expiration of the Applicable Statute of Limitations by Defendant Christina J. Bruff Dumars. (Daniel, Lacy)
December 19, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Party to Dismiss Defendant Matthew J. Bruff, or Alternatively, Re-align Defendant Matthew J. Bruff as a Party Plaintiff Due to Fraudulent Joinder Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 21 by Defendant Christina J. Bruff Dumars. (Daniel, Lacy)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. Each partys lead trial counsel shall attend the conference. The conference shall be held in Courtroom A-902, Alfred A. Arraj U.S. Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. The parties are directed to jointly contact Chambers by telephone at (303) 844-4694 or by email at Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov to obtain a scheduling conference date. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 12/19/18. (rbjsec. )
December 18, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lacy A. Daniel on behalf of Christina J. Bruff Dumars (Daniel, Lacy)
December 18, 2018 Filing 9 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #8 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-03240-RBJ. (Text Only Entry) (ktera)
December 18, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE for reassignment by Judge Richard P. Matsch. (ktera)
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by attorneyLacy A. Daniel.Attorney or pro se has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed, not an inked, signature to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (rroge, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER of Defendant Matthew J. Bruff to #2 Complaint by Matthew J Bruff.(rroge, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rroge, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Richard P. Matsch and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rroge, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief against Matthew J Bruff, Christina J. Bruff Dumars, filed by Aspen Glade, Ltd., David Mindock.(rroge, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Christina Bruff DuMars from District Court, Summit County, Colorado, Case Number 2018CV30141. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6443998), filed by Christina Bruff DuMars. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Record State Court Summons, #2 Preliminary Record State Court Complaint, #3 Preliminary Record State Court Answer by Matthew J. Bruff, #4 Preliminary Record State Court Order re Discovery Protocol, #5 Preliminary Record State Court Order re Duty to Confer, #6 Preliminary Record State Court Waiver of Service by Christina Bruff DuMars, #7 Docket Sheet State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Daniel, Lacy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mindock et al v. Bruff Dumars et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina J. Bruff Dumars
Represented By: Lacy A. Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew J Bruff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Mindock
Represented By: Robert N. Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aspen Glade, Ltd.
Represented By: Robert N. Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?