In Re: David Lee Smith and Mary Julia Hook

Interested Party: United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado and U.S. Trustee
Appellee: Dennis W. King
Appellant: Mary Julia Hook and David Lee Smith
Case Number: 1:2018cv03259
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Supplement/Amend Notice of Appeal; Request for Extension of Time to File Brief by Appellants Mary Julia Hook, David Lee Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Supplemental/Amended Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election, #2 Exhibit 2 US Bankruptcy Order) (athom, ) Modified on 2/8/2019 to correct text (athom, ).
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Establishing Bankruptcy Appeal Briefing Requirements re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, filed by Mary Julia Hook, David Lee Smith. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 01/25/2019. (athom, )
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Assigning Case to AP Docket, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 1/24/2019. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-3259-REB (angar, )
January 24, 2019 Filing 12 SUPPLEMENTAL BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL. Number of Volumes: 1. Sealed/Restricted Volume Numbers:IV. (Attachments: #1 Volume IV - Restricted through April 22, 2019)(angar, )
January 22, 2019 Filing 11 BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL. Number of Volumes: 3. Appellant Brief due by 2/21/2019. Appellee Brief due by 3/23/2019. Appellant Reply Brief due by 4/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Volume I, #2 Volume I - part 2, #3 Volume II, #4 Volume III)(angar, )
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DIRECTING APPELLANTS TO CURE DEFICIENCY within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Any papers that Appellants file in response to this Order must include the civil action number on the Order. That Appellants shall each obtain and utilize the Court-approved Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Alternatively, Appellants may obtain the form in person at the United States District Court Clerks Office, Alfred Arraj Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. That if Appellants fail to cure the designated deficiency within thirty (30) days from the date of this order the notice of appeal and the action will be dismissed without further notice. That the Motion to Pay Appeal Filing Fee in Installments (ECF No. #3 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for the reasons stated herein, By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/19/2018. (evana, )
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Denying #3 Motion to Pay Filing Fee in Installments, by Thomas B. McNamara, United States Bankruptcy Judge, by Clerk on 12/19/2018. (evana, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Deficiency Failure to Pay Filing Fees by Interested Party United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado (evana, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 CASE OPENING. The above captioned case was opened on 17 December 2018 and assigned the case number referenced above. After docketing of the record on appeal from the U.S. Bankruptcy Court, briefing will proceed in accordance with Bankruptcy Rules 8014, 8015, and 8018, and any orders of the court. When referencing trial exhibits you must attach copies to your brief. If the court finds it necessary to have the originals presented it will issue an order. All filings with the United States District Court, unless otherwise permitted by our Electronic Case Filing Procedures, must be done electronically. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Denying Debtor's Motion to Vacate and Set Aside Order Accepting Trustee's Report and Closing Case; and Order Denying Debtor's Motion to Continue Automatic Stay Pending Disposition of Motion to Vacate By U.S. Bankruptcy Judge Thomas B. McNamara on 4 December 2018. (cmadr, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER overruling the Debtor's Objection to the Final Report and closing case By U.S. Bankruptcy Judge Thomas B. McNamara on 2 August 2018. (cmadr, ) Modified to correct document title on 12/19/2018 (cmadr, ).
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER and Notice of Non-Evidentiary Hearing By U.S. Bankruptcy Judge Thomas B. McNamara on 17 July 2018. (cmadr, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 Motion to Pay Appeal Filing Fee in Installments by Appellants Mary Julia Hook, David Lee Smith. (cmadr, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT by Appellants Mary Julia Hook, David Lee Smith in re: Order and Notice of Non-Evidentiary Hearing, Minute Order, Order Accepting Trustee's Report and Closing Case, and Order Denying Debtor's Motion to Vacate of 12/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Claims Register, #3 Notice of Transmittal)(cmadr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: David Lee Smith and Mary Julia Hook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: U.S. Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Dennis W. King
Represented By: Joli Ann Lofstedt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Mary Julia Hook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: David Lee Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?