Pensford Financial Group, LLC v. 303 Software, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Pensford Financial Group, Inc. and Pensford Financial Group, LLC
Defendant: 303 Software, Inc., Damon Delgado and Matthew Jaffe
Case Number: 1:2018cv03286
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Referring Judge: Raymond P Moore
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332t
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PROTECTIVE ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 2/15/2019. The parties shall, nevertheless, comply with Colorado Local Rule 7.2. (skclc1)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM regarding #16 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Pensford Financial Group, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 2/15/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
February 15, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff Pensford Financial Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Stipulated Protective Order)(Schindler, Alan)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Scheduling Conference set for 3/6/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 1/9/19. (amont, )
January 3, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Pensford Financial Group, LLC. All Defendants. (Schindler, Alan)
December 26, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (cthom, )
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 12/26/2018. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Entered By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 12/26/2018. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
December 26, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Damon Delgado by Plaintiff Pensford Financial Group, LLC. (Schindler, Alan)
December 26, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Matthew Jaffe by Plaintiff Pensford Financial Group, LLC. (Schindler, Alan)
December 26, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS REQUEST as to 303 Software, Inc. by Plaintiff Pensford Financial Group, LLC. (Schindler, Alan)
December 26, 2018 Filing 7 Exhibits in Support of #2 Complaint by Plaintiff Pensford Financial Group, LLC. (Schindler, Alan)
December 24, 2018 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (rsams, )
December 24, 2018 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
December 24, 2018 Filing 4 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #2 Complaint filed by attorney Edward P. Timmins. The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry). (rsams, )
December 24, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Schindler, Alan)
December 24, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6454755)Attorney Alan Daniel Schindler added to party Pensford Financial Group, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Pensford Financial Group, Inc..(Schindler, Alan)
December 24, 2018 Filing 1 Administrative Notice: No initiating document. Attorney contacted with instructions to file the initiating document within 24 hours. (Text Only Entry) (dbera, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pensford Financial Group, LLC v. 303 Software, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pensford Financial Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pensford Financial Group, LLC
Represented By: Edward P. Timmins
Represented By: Alan Daniel Schindler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 303 Software, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damon Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?