Njorooge v. Choate

Petitioner: Nelson Njorooge
Respondent: Jonny Choate, Ronald Vitiello, Johnny Choate, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Jeffrey D. Lynch and Matthew Whitaker
Case Number: 1:2018cv03301
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Referring Judge: William J Martinez
2 Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241in
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Filing 10 Return Receipt upon the United States Attorney General (dkals, )
January 31, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #7 Order to Show Cause, #6 Amended Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus for Service of Process. (Attachments: #1 USPS Certified Receipts) (dbera, )
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Drawing Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge William J. Martinez and Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-03301-WJM-STV. (sphil, )
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 1/29/2019. ORDERED that Respondents show cause within twenty-one days from the date of this Order why the Application should not be granted. ORDERED that within twenty-one days of Respondents' answer to this Order Applicant may file a Reply, if any. (sphil, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241, filed by Nelson Njorooge.(sphil, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2241 filed by Nelson Njorooge.(sphil, )
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that the Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction and Writ of Habeas Corpus, ECF No. #3 , is DENIED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant file, within thirty days from the date of this Order, an Amended Application as directed. That if Applicant fails to file an Amended Applicant that complies with this Order within the time allowed the action may be dismissed, or otherwise construed, without further notice. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/27/2018. (evana, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction and Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Nelson Njorooge. (rvill, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2241 (Filing fee $ 5, Receipt Number COX088182), filed by Nelson Njorooge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reference, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24)(rvill, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Njorooge v. Choate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jonny Choate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ronald Vitiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Johnny Choate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kirstjen M. Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeffrey D. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nelson Njorooge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?