Bullock et al v. Capital One Financial Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Tim A Bullock, Linda M. Bullock, Tim Bullock and Linda Bullock
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corp. and Dillon Companies L.L.C
Case Number: 1:2018cv03320
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1638
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Continue. The Scheduling Conference is RESET for 4/15/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall submit their proposed scheduling order on or before 4/8/2019. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 2/21/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc1)
February 15, 2019 Filing 20 Stipulated MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference Now Set for March 5th, 2019 by Plaintiffs Linda Bullock, Tim Bullock. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only), #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form)(Bullock, Timothy)
February 14, 2019 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Pratt, Katherine)
February 12, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Defenses, Affirmative Defenses, and Jury Demand by Dillon Companies L.L.C.(Pratt, Katherine)
February 11, 2019 Filing 17 ERRATA re #10 Summons Returned Executed Corrected by Plaintiffs Linda Bullock, Tim Bullock. (Bullock, Timothy)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time. Dillon Companies L.L.C's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is 2/12/2019. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 2/4/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc1)
January 31, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Katherine M.L. Pratt by Katherine M.L. Pratt on behalf of Dillon Companies L.L.CAttorney Katherine M.L. Pratt added to party Dillon Companies L.L.C(pty:dft) (Pratt, Katherine)
January 31, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Saugat K. Thapa by Saugat K. Thapa on behalf of Dillon Companies L.L.CAttorney Saugat K. Thapa added to party Dillon Companies L.L.C(pty:dft) (Thapa, Saugat)
January 31, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Larry S. McClung by Larry S. McClung on behalf of Dillon Companies L.L.C (McClung, Larry)
January 31, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Dillon Companies L.L.C. (McClung, Larry)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINEFOR FILING CONSENT/NONCONSENT FORM Scheduling Conference set for 3/5/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Consent Form due by 2/26/2019. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 1/30/19. (amont, )
January 29, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tim Bullock, Linda Bullock. Dillon Companies L.L.C served on 1/14/2019, answer due 2/4/2019. (Bullock, Timothy)
January 28, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Tara Leigh Elgie added to party Capital One Financial Corp.(pty:dft) by Capital One Financial Corp..(Elgie, Tara)
January 11, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Capital One Financial Corp. served on 1/7/2019, answer due 1/28/2019. (Bullock, Timothy)
January 8, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued by Clerk to Dillon Companies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (nmarb, )
January 4, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Dillon Companies, dab King Soopers re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Linda Bullock, Tim Bullock. (Bullock, Timothy)
December 26, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (dbera, )
December 26, 2018 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Capital One Financial Corporation, Dillon Companies L.L.C. re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Linda M. Bullock, Tim A Bullock. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Bullock, Timothy)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 STATEMENT Civil Case Cover Sheet by Plaintiffs Linda M. Bullock, Tim A Bullock. (Bullock, Timothy)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6456001)Attorney Timothy A. Bullock added to party Linda M. Bullock(pty:pla), Attorney Timothy A. Bullock added to party Tim A Bullock(pty:pla), filed by Tim A Bullock, Linda M. Bullock.(Bullock, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bullock et al v. Capital One Financial Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim A Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda M. Bullock
Represented By: Timothy A. Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Bullock
Represented By: Timothy A. Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Bullock
Represented By: Timothy A. Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corp.
Represented By: Tara Leigh Elgie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dillon Companies L.L.C
Represented By: Saugat K. Thapa
Represented By: Larry S. McClung
Represented By: Katherine M.L. Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?