Hawkins v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Monte Lee Hawkins
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Interested Party: USAO-SS-Noticing and SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2019cv00023
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sara Pappas Bellamy on behalf of Commissioner, Social Security AdministrationAttorney Sara Pappas Bellamy added to party Commissioner, Social Security Administration(pty:dft) (Bellamy, Sara)
February 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by J. Benedict Garcia on behalf of Commissioner, Social Security AdministrationAttorney J. Benedict Garcia added to party Commissioner, Social Security Administration(pty:dft) (Garcia, J.)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 01/04/2019. (athom, )
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING INSTRUCTIONS FOR JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 01/04/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Form) (athom, )
January 4, 2019 Filing 6 Utility Setting Deadlines: Commissioner, Social Security Administration answer due 3/5/2019. Text Only Entry (athom, )
January 4, 2019 Filing 5 Administrative Notice: Social Security Case Service. Pursuant to the Letter of Agreement signed by the Clerk, U.S. District Court;U.S. Attorneys Office for the District of Colorado (USAO), and Social Security Administration (SSA), service of the initiating document(s) by the plaintiff to the SSA, the U.S. Attorney General, and USAO in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i) is not necessary unless the court otherwise orders. A summons is not required and will not be issued. (Text Only Entry) (rroge, )
January 4, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rroge, )
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff MONTE LEE HAWKINS. (Seckar, Michael)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NANCY A. BERRYHILL Attorney Michael W. Seckar added to party MONTE LEE HAWKINS(pty:pla), filed by MONTE LEE HAWKINS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seckar, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawkins v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: USAO-SS-Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Represented By: Sara Pappas Bellamy
Represented By: J. Benedict Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monte Lee Hawkins
Represented By: Michael W. Seckar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?