Banks et al v. Hilton Grand Vacations Company, LLC

Plaintiff: Sonia Gryske, Diane E Levine, Joni Brands, Julie Joanne Kiley, Marie Crichlow, Joel Cascio, Colleen Talkington, Kelly Lomsdalen, Rick Hammel, Melinda Heichel, Denain Nicole Green, Michael Garfield Collier, Michael Cruz, Verna Gibson, Horace Huntley, Pilsun Johnson, Rhodalynn Vitales Johnson, Robert Crichlow, Frances Brantley, Terri Soltis, Jeremy Banks, Keith Sutton, Julia Fairbanks, Willie Wade, Richard Soltis, Pamela Taylor, David Bartholomew, Vicki Jenkins, Grace Cruz, Barbara Huntley, Randall Talkington, Daniel Brantley, Denico Ali Green, Crystal Jenkins, Tyrone Gibson and Ashley Cascio
Defendant: Hilton Grand Vacations Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00051
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331fr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Filing 9 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal or stipulation to dismiss filed in this case on 2/6/2019. Text Only Entry (jgonz, )
February 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case without Prejudice by Plaintiffs Jeremy Banks, David Bartholomew, Joni Brands, Daniel Brantley, Frances Brantley, Ashley Cascio, Joel Cascio, Michael Garfield Collier, Marie Crichlow, Robert Crichlow, Grace Cruz, Michael Cruz, Julia Fairbanks, Tyrone Gibson, Verna Gibson, Denain Nicole Green, Denico Ali Green, Sonia Gryske, Rick Hammel, Melinda Heichel, Barbara Huntley, Horace Huntley, Crystal Jenkins, Vicki Jenkins, Pilsun Johnson, Rhodalynn Vitales Johnson, Julie Joanne Kiley, Diane E Levine, Kelly Lomsdalen, Richard Soltis, Terri Soltis, Keith Sutton, Colleen Talkington, Randall Talkington, Pamela Taylor, Willie Wade (Osborne, Matthew)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: returnable by Plaintiffs why this case should not be dismissed due to the Courts lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 2/6/2019, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 1/23/2019. (jgonz, )
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rkeec)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #4 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00051-STV. (Text Only Entry) (rkeec)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. (rkeec)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (rroge, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hilton Grand Vacations Company, LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6472500)Attorney Matthew Ross Osborne added to party Jeremy Banks(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Ross Osborne added to party David Bartholomew(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Ross Osborne added to party Joni Brands(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Ross Osborne added to party Daniel Brantley(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Ross Osborne added to party Frances Brantley(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Ross Osborne added to party Ashley Cascio(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Ross Osborne added to party Joel Cascio(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Ross Osborne added to party Michael Garfield Collier(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Ross Osborne added to party Marie Crichlow(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Ross Osborne added to party Robert Crichlow(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Ross Osborne added to party Grace Cruz(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Ross Osborne added to party Michael Cruz(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Ross Osborne added to party Julia Fairbanks(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Ross Osborne added to party Tyrone Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Ross Osborne added to party Verna Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Ross Osborne added to party Denain Nicole Green(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Ross Osborne added to party Denico Ali Green(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Ross Osborne added to party Sonia Gryske(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Ross Osborne added to party Rick Hammel(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Ross Osborne added to party Melinda Heichel(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Ross Osborne added to party Barbara Huntley(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Ross Osborne added to party Horace Huntley(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Ross Osborne added to party Crystal Jenkins(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Ross Osborne added to party Vicki Jenkins(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Ross Osborne added to party Pilsun Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Ross Osborne added to party Rhodalynn Vitales Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Ross Osborne added to party Julie Joanne Kiley(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Ross Osborne added to party Diane E Levine(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Ross Osborne added to party Kelly Lomsdalen(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Ross Osborne added to party Richard Soltis(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Ross Osborne added to party Terri Soltis(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Ross Osborne added to party Keith Sutton(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Ross Osborne added to party Colleen Talkington(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Ross Osborne added to party Randall Talkington(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Ross Osborne added to party Pamela Taylor(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Ross Osborne added to party Willie Wade(pty:pla), filed by Randall Talkington, Colleen Talkington, Melinda Heichel, Michael Garfield Collier, Crystal Jenkins, Denain Nicole Green, David Bartholomew, Jeremy Banks, Sonia Gryske, Terri Soltis, Denico Ali Green, Pilsun Johnson, Vicki Jenkins, Rhodalynn Vitales Johnson, Joni Brands, Verna Gibson, Barbara Huntley, Robert Crichlow, Richard Soltis, Keith Sutton, Michael Cruz, Kelly Lomsdalen, Julia Fairbanks, Horace Huntley, Diane E Levine, Joel Cascio, Willie Wade, Daniel Brantley, Marie Crichlow, Grace Cruz, Tyrone Gibson, Julie Joanne Kiley, Frances Brantley, Pamela Taylor, Rick Hammel, Ashley Cascio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiffs' Supplemental Facts, #2 Proposed Document Summons)(Osborne, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banks et al v. Hilton Grand Vacations Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonia Gryske
Represented By: Matthew Ross Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane E Levine
Represented By: Matthew Ross Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joni Brands
Represented By: Matthew Ross Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Joanne Kiley
Represented By: Matthew Ross Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Crichlow
Represented By: Matthew Ross Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Cascio
Represented By: Matthew Ross Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Talkington
Represented By: Matthew Ross Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Lomsdalen
Represented By: Matthew Ross Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Hammel
Represented By: Matthew Ross Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melinda Heichel
Represented By: Matthew Ross Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denain Nicole Green
Represented By: Matthew Ross Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Garfield Collier
Represented By: Matthew Ross Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Cruz
Represented By: Matthew Ross Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verna Gibson
Represented By: Matthew Ross Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Horace Huntley
Represented By: Matthew Ross Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pilsun Johnson
Represented By: Matthew Ross Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhodalynn Vitales Johnson
Represented By: Matthew Ross Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Crichlow
Represented By: Matthew Ross Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Brantley
Represented By: Matthew Ross Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Soltis
Represented By: Matthew Ross Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Banks
Represented By: Matthew Ross Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Sutton
Represented By: Matthew Ross Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Fairbanks
Represented By: Matthew Ross Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Wade
Represented By: Matthew Ross Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Soltis
Represented By: Matthew Ross Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Taylor
Represented By: Matthew Ross Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Bartholomew
Represented By: Matthew Ross Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Jenkins
Represented By: Matthew Ross Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grace Cruz
Represented By: Matthew Ross Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Huntley
Represented By: Matthew Ross Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Talkington
Represented By: Matthew Ross Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Brantley
Represented By: Matthew Ross Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denico Ali Green
Represented By: Matthew Ross Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Jenkins
Represented By: Matthew Ross Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone Gibson
Represented By: Matthew Ross Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Cascio
Represented By: Matthew Ross Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Grand Vacations Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?