Data Scape Limited v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Data Scape Limited
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc. and Amazon Digital Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00056
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
0 Judge: R Brooke Jackson
1 Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #32 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint. Amazon Digital Services, LLC and Amazon.com, Inc.'s answer or response is due by 4/12/2019. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 3/6/19. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER: A Scheduling Conference is set for 5/7/2019 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 3/6/19. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
March 6, 2019 Filing 32 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendants Amazon Digital Services, LLC, Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time To Respond to Complaint)(Hadden, J.)
February 28, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Eric Bryan Fenster on behalf of Data Scape Limited (Fenster, Eric)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. In light of the decline of consent to a magistrate judge by one or more of the parties in this case and its reassignment to this Court, the Scheduling Conference set March 5, 2019 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak is VACATED. The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1. The parties are directed to jointly contact Chambers by telephone at (303) 844-4694 or by email at Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov to obtain a scheduling conference date within 14 days of the date of this order. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 2/20/19. (rbjsec. )
February 19, 2019 Filing 29 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #26 Objections filed by attorneyJay Young Chung.The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (dkals, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE. Case returned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson for all further proceedings. Judge Robert E. Blackburn is no longer assigned to case. (dkals, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 27 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #26 Non Consent Form. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00056-REB. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
February 14, 2019 Filing 26 OBJECTIONS to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction by Plaintiff Data Scape Limited. (Fenster, Eric)
January 31, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brian David Ledahl on behalf of Data Scape LimitedAttorney Brian David Ledahl added to party Data Scape Limited(pty:pla) (Ledahl, Brian)
January 31, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Reza Mirzaie on behalf of Data Scape LimitedAttorney Reza Mirzaie added to party Data Scape Limited(pty:pla) (Mirzaie, Reza)
January 31, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Marc Aaron Fenster on behalf of Data Scape LimitedAttorney Marc Aaron Fenster added to party Data Scape Limited(pty:pla) (Fenster, Marc)
January 31, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Paul Anthony Kroeger on behalf of Data Scape LimitedAttorney Paul Anthony Kroeger added to party Data Scape Limited(pty:pla) (Kroeger, Paul)
January 31, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jay Young Chung on behalf of Data Scape LimitedAttorney Jay Young Chung added to party Data Scape Limited(pty:pla) (Chung, Jay)
January 31, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Philip X. Wang on behalf of Data Scape LimitedAttorney Philip X. Wang added to party Data Scape Limited(pty:pla) (Wang, Philip)
January 30, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ravi R. Ranganath on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Ravi R. Ranganath added to party Amazon Digital Services, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Ravi R. Ranganath added to party Amazon.com, Inc.(pty:dft) (Ranganath, Ravi)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint until 3/11/2019, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 1/30/2019. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, )
January 29, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Saina S. Shamilov on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Saina S. Shamilov added to party Amazon Digital Services, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Saina S. Shamilov added to party Amazon.com, Inc.(pty:dft) (Shamilov, Saina)
January 29, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendants Amazon Digital Services, LLC, Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Hadden, J.)
January 22, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Data Scape Limited. Amazon Digital Services, LLC served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019; Amazon.com, Inc. served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (Fenster, Eric)
January 15, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance for Marc A. Fenster by Eric Bryan Fenster on behalf of Data Scape Limited (Fenster, Eric)
January 15, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Fenster, Eric)
January 15, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Eric Bryan Fenster on behalf of Data Scape Limited (Fenster, Eric)
January 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Philip X. Wang by Eric Bryan Fenster on behalf of Data Scape Limited (Fenster, Eric)
January 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Reza Mirzaie by Eric Bryan Fenster on behalf of Data Scape Limited (Fenster, Eric)
January 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Brian D. Ledahl by Eric Bryan Fenster on behalf of Data Scape Limited (Fenster, Eric)
January 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Paul Kroeger by Eric Bryan Fenster on behalf of Data Scape Limited (Fenster, Eric)
January 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Jay Chung by Eric Bryan Fenster on behalf of Data Scape Limited (Fenster, Eric)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 3/5/2019 11:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 2/19/2019, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 1/9/2019. (jgonz, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 Report re Patent: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (rvill, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Amazon.com, Inc. et al re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Data Scape Limited. (Fenster, Eric)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amazon Digital Services, LLC, Amazon.com, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6474025)Attorney Eric Bryan Fenster added to party Data Scape Limited(pty:pla), filed by Data Scape Limited. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F)(Fenster, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Data Scape Limited v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Data Scape Limited
Represented By: Eric Bryan Fenster
Represented By: Brian David Ledahl
Represented By: Philip X. Wang
Represented By: Marc Aaron Fenster
Represented By: Paul Anthony Kroeger
Represented By: Reza Mirzaie
Represented By: Jay Young Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By: J. David Hadden, III
Represented By: Ravi R. Ranganath
Represented By: Saina S. Shamilov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Digital Services, LLC
Represented By: J. David Hadden, III
Represented By: Ravi R. Ranganath
Represented By: Saina S. Shamilov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?