Nazzise et al v. Selene Financial LP et al

Plaintiff: Sandra Bowen and Steven Nazzise
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc, Equifax Information Services, LLC and Selene Financial LP
Case Number: 1:2019cv00070
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y Daniel
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 19 CASE REASSIGNED. All parties do not consent/time elapsed. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00070-WYD. (Text Only Entry) (slibi, )
March 7, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lauren Michelle Wood on behalf of Trans Union, LLCAttorney Lauren Michelle Wood added to party Trans Union, LLC(pty:dft) (Wood, Lauren)
March 1, 2019 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Miller, Zachary)
March 1, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Selene Financial LP.(Miller, Zachary)
February 27, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Zachary D. Miller by Zachary David Miller on behalf of Selene Financial LPAttorney Zachary David Miller added to party Selene Financial LP(pty:dft) (Miller, Zachary)
February 25, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Trans Union, LLC.(Olson, Elizabeth)
February 13, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Robyn Berger Averbach (Averbach, Robyn)
February 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Donna Woo on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, IncAttorney Donna Woo added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc(pty:dft) (Woo, Donna)
February 4, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Garnett, Megan)
February 4, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, of Equifax Information Services LLC Attorney Megan Rose Garnett added to party Equifax Information Services, LLC(pty:dft) by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Garnett, Megan)
February 4, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Online Date Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Service LLC, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Averbach, Robyn)
February 4, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Attorney Robyn Berger Averbach added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc(pty:dft) by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(Averbach, Robyn)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 1/31/2019. Trans Union, LLC answer due 2/25/2019. (tsher, )
January 30, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent T. Rowe Price Group Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion, Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC. (Olson, Elizabeth)
January 30, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Trans Union, LLC. (Olson, Elizabeth)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Non-Consent Form, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 1/10/2019. Consent/Non-Consent Form due on or before 3/7/2019. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 3/21/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (slibi, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc, Selene Financial LP, Trans Union, LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6475110)Attorney Matthew Ross Osborne added to party Sandra Bowen(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Ross Osborne added to party Steven Nazzise(pty:pla), filed by Steven Nazzise, Sandra Bowen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document Summons (Selene), #2 Proposed Document Summons (Experian), #3 Proposed Document Summons (Trans Union), #4 Proposed Document Summons (Equifax))(Osborne, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nazzise et al v. Selene Financial LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Bowen
Represented By: Matthew Ross Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Nazzise
Represented By: Matthew Ross Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth K. Olson
Represented By: Lauren Michelle Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc
Represented By: Donna Woo
Represented By: Robyn Berger Averbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Megan Rose Garnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selene Financial LP
Represented By: Zachary David Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?