Alliance of Nuclear Workers Advocacy Groups et al

Defendant: USA
Petitioner: Rocky Mountain Peace & Justice Center, Environmental Information Network (EIN) Inc., Alliance of Nuclear Workers Advocacy Groups, Rocky Flats Neighborhood Association, Candelas Glows/Rocky Flats Glows, Rocky Flats Right to Know and Rocky Flats Downwinders
Case Number: 1:2019cv00076
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 9 Utility Setting/Resetting Deadlines/Hearings: USA answer due 4/2/2019 pursuant to #8 Stipulation. Text Only Entry (nmarb, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 8 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Petition/Application,,,, by Defendant USA. (Brenton, Kyle) Modified on 3/6/2019 to show as a stipulation and take off gavel from entry pursuant to direction from the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Mix. (nmarb, ).
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/27/19. Consent Form due by 3/14/2019. (lgale, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kyle W. Brenton on behalf of USAAttorney Kyle W. Brenton added to party USA(pty:dft) (Brenton, Kyle)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-76-KLM (angar, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rvill, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 Case has been randomly assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re: #1 Petition filed by attorney Patricia A. Mellen. Attorney has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed signature to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (rvill, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR DISCLOSURE OF CERTAIN DOCUMENTS PROVIDED TO SPECIAL FEDERAL GRAND JURY 89-2 (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6476153)Attorney Patricia A. Mellen added to party Alliance of Nuclear Workers Advocacy Groups(pty:pet), Attorney Patricia A. Mellen added to party Candelas Glows/Rocky Flats Glows(pty:pet), Attorney Patricia A. Mellen added to party Environmental Information Network (EIN) Inc.(pty:pet), Attorney Patricia A. Mellen added to party Rocky Flats Downwinders(pty:pet), Attorney Patricia A. Mellen added to party Rocky Flats Neighborhood Association(pty:pet), Attorney Patricia A. Mellen added to party Rocky Flats Right to Know(pty:pet), Attorney Patricia A. Mellen added to party Rocky Mountain Peace & Justice Center(pty:pet), filed by Rocky Flats Right to Know, Environmental Information Network (EIN) Inc., Alliance of Nuclear Workers Advocacy Groups, Candelas Glows/Rocky Flats Glows, Rocky Mountain Peace & Justice Center, Rocky Flats Downwinders, Rocky Flats Neighborhood Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Table of Waste Disposal Areas, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Grand Jury Subpoenas)(Mellen, Patricia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alliance of Nuclear Workers Advocacy Groups et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rocky Mountain Peace & Justice Center
Represented By: Patricia A. Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Environmental Information Network (EIN) Inc.
Represented By: Patricia A. Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alliance of Nuclear Workers Advocacy Groups
Represented By: Patricia A. Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rocky Flats Neighborhood Association
Represented By: Patricia A. Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Candelas Glows/Rocky Flats Glows
Represented By: Patricia A. Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rocky Flats Right to Know
Represented By: Patricia A. Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rocky Flats Downwinders
Represented By: Patricia A. Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Kyle W. Brenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?