Lantz v. G&S Sales & Pawn LLC et al
Plaintiff: Michael Lantz
Defendant: G&S Sales & Pawn LLC and Sharon Marquardt
Case Number: 1:2019cv00080
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Lantz. G&S Sales & Pawn LLC served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019; Sharon Marquardt served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Parady, Sarah)
February 6, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First Amended) against G&S Sales & Pawn LLC, Sharon Marquardt, filed by Michael Lantz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FLSA Consent Form)(Parady, Sarah)
February 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading First Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Michael Lantz (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1-Redlined Complaint)(Parady, Sarah)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 4/22/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document) (jgonz, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (dbera, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by James Bennett Lebsack on behalf of Michael LantzAttorney James Bennett Lebsack added to party Michael Lantz(pty:pla) (Lebsack, James)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against G&S Sales & Pawn LLC, Sharon Marquardt (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6476757)Attorney Sarah J. Parady added to party Michael Lantz(pty:pla), filed by Michael Lantz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FLSA Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons G&S Sales & Pawn LLC, #4 Summons Sharon Marquardt)(Parady, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lantz v. G&S Sales & Pawn LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lantz
Represented By: James Bennett Lebsack
Represented By: Sarah J. Parady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G&S Sales & Pawn LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Marquardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?