USA v. Bartelds et al

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Bridget F. Bartelds, Estate at Lone Tree Homeowner's Association, Inc., The, Adam Smith, U.S. Bank NA, Colorado Department of Revenue, Shen Smith and Guy's Floor Service, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00082
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
0 Judge: Wiley Y Daniel
1 Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 26:7403
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 1/23/2019. Consent Form due by 3/21/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 4/4/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (tsher, )
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rkeec)
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #6 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00082-NRN. (Text Only Entry) (rkeec)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. (rkeec)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (evana, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Colorado Department of Revenue; Guy's Floor Service, Inc.; Estate at Lone Tree Homeowner's Association; U.S. Bank NA re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons to CO Department of Revenue, #2 Proposed Summons to Guy's Floor Service, #3 Proposed Summons to Estate at Lone Tree HOA, #4 Proposed Summons to U.S. Bank NA)(Bourget, Boris)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Summons submitted not issued. All defendants must be listed on the caption. (rvill, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Attorney Boris Bourget added to party United States of America(pty:pla), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons to CO Attorney General, #4 Proposed Summons to CO Department of Revenue, #5 Proposed Summons to Guy's Floor Service, #6 Proposed Summons to the Estate at Lone Tree HOA, #7 Proposed Summons to U.S. Bank NA)(Bourget, Boris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Bartelds et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridget F. Bartelds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate at Lone Tree Homeowner's Association, Inc., The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Department of Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guy's Floor Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Boris Bourget
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?