Denver House Rentals, LLC v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Denver House Rentals, LLC
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00102
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Richard P Matsch
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 PROCEDURAL ORDER NUMBER ONE. counsel will meet and confer as required by Rule 26(f)(2) within 30 days from the date of this order. Lead counsel shall attend the conference in person. The disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1)(A) shall be made within 14 days after that conference. Counsel for the plaintiff(s) will telephone chambers [303-844-4627] within 10 days after the disclosures to set a date and time for a Scheduling Conference pursuant to Rule 16. The instructions for preparation of the Scheduling Order and the form of that order are found at http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/judges/judges.aspx. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for the defendant shall file a disclosurestatement pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1., by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/28/2019. (evana, )
February 27, 2019 Filing 26 ANSWER to #17 Amended Complaint and Jury Demand by Auto-Owners Insurance Company.(Knight, Linda)
February 13, 2019 Filing 25 COURTROOM MINUTES for Motion Hearing held on 2/13/2019 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. ORDERED: Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company's Motion to Compel Appraisal and Stay Litigation or Administratively Close Case #14 is DENIED, for reasons stated on record. Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company shall provide an answer to the Amended Complaint #17 within 14 days. FTR: K. Tersaki. (sgrim)
February 12, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE to #20 MOTION for Discovery Limited filed by Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Fiene, Elayna)
February 12, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to #14 MOTION to Compel Appraisal and Stay Litigation or Administratively Close Case filed by Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Chad Kimball, #3 Exhibit C - Assessor's Records, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Andrew Bakker, #5 Exhibit E - Sworn Statement in Proof of Loss, #6 Exhibit F - Adjusters International Estimate, #7 Exhibit G - October 3, 2018 Letter, #8 Exhibit H - Declaration of Gary Stevens)(Ridley, Terence)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER The following motions have been set for hearing on February 13, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom A, Second Floor, the Byron White United States Courthouse, 1823 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado: #14 - Motion to Compel Appraisal and Stay or Administratively Close Case #15 - Motion for Extension of Time to Respond #20 - Motion for Discovery, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/4/2019. (ktera)
February 1, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE to #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #3 Complaint (Opposed Motion) filed by Plaintiff Denver House Rentals, LLC. (Waneka, Nelson)
February 1, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Discovery Limited by Plaintiff Denver House Rentals, LLC. (Waneka, Nelson)
February 1, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE to #14 MOTION to Compel Appraisal and Stay Litigation or Administratively Close Case and Request for Hearing filed by Plaintiff Denver House Rentals, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Waneka, Nelson)
January 31, 2019 Filing 18 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #17 Amended Complaint filed by attorney Nelson A. Waneka. Attorney has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures. Business Address, Phone, fax numbers and e-mail address are missing. (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. (Text Only Entry) (evana, )
January 31, 2019 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Auto-Owners Insurance Company, filed by Denver House Rentals, LLC.(Waneka, Nelson)
January 22, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing State Court Docket Sheet by Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(Fiene, Elayna)
January 17, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #3 Complaint (Opposed Motion) by Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) (Knight, Linda)
January 17, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Compel Appraisal and Stay Litigation or Administratively Close Case by Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) , #2 Exhibit A)(Knight, Linda)
January 15, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Elizabeth A. Walker on behalf of Denver House Rentals, LLCAttorney Elizabeth A. Walker added to party Denver House Rentals, LLC(pty:pla) (Walker, Elizabeth)
January 15, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Elisabeth L. Owen on behalf of Denver House Rentals, LLCAttorney Elisabeth L. Owen added to party Denver House Rentals, LLC(pty:pla) (Owen, Elisabeth)
January 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nelson Andrew Waneka on behalf of Denver House Rentals, LLCAttorney Nelson Andrew Waneka added to party Denver House Rentals, LLC(pty:pla) (Waneka, Nelson)
January 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Bradley Aaron Levin on behalf of Denver House Rentals, LLCAttorney Bradley Aaron Levin added to party Denver House Rentals, LLC(pty:pla) (Levin, Bradley)
January 11, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Ridley, Terence)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER VACATING DELAY REDUCTION ORDER. Upon reassignment of this civil action and this Court's case management procedures, it is ORDERED that the Delay Reduction Order and the Pretrial Order entered in the Denver District Court on December 7, 2019, is vacated, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/11/2019. (evana, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rvill, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Judge Richard P. Matsch and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 STATE COURT ORDER Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading. Signed by Denver County District Court Judge Robert Lewis McGahey, Jr. on January 1, 2019. (rvill, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Auto-Owners Insurance Company on 12/12/2018. (rvill, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Auto-Owners Insurance Company, filed by Denver House Rentals, LLC.(rvill, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rvill, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Auto-Owners Insurance Company from Denver County District Court, Case Number 2018CV34520. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6478731), filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sworn Statement in Proof of Loss, #2 Exhibit B - Denver House Rentals SOS, #3 Exhibit C - Impressive LLC - SOS Nevada, #4 Exhibit D - DOI - Auto-Owners Insurance Company, #5 Exhibit E - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #6 State Court - Complaint - 12-06-18, #7 State Court - Summons - 12-13-18, #8 State Court - Civil Cover Sheet - 12-06-18, #9 State Court - Return of Service - 12-13-18, #10 State Court - Delay Reduction Order - 12-07-18, #11 State Court - Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint - 12-28-18, #12 State Court - Order Granting With Amendments Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint - 01-01-19, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(Knight, Linda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Denver House Rentals, LLC v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denver House Rentals, LLC
Represented By: Nelson Andrew Waneka
Represented By: Elisabeth L. Owen
Represented By: Bradley Aaron Levin
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Linda Jane Knight
Represented By: Terence M. Ridley
Represented By: Elayna M. Fiene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?