Bath v. Experian Information Solutions Inc et al

Plaintiff: Brian Bath
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc, Bank of America, Bank of Missouri, dba OLLO, CitiBank NA, Capital One Bank, (USA) NA., Trans Union LLC, Barclays Bank PLC, Discover Financial Services, J.P Morgan Chase, American Express Company, Wells Fargo Merchant Services, Equifax Information Services LLC, Onemain Financial Services, Inc, LexisNexis Risk Solutions, Inc., TD Bank, Realpage, Inc., PayPal, Wells Fargo Merchant Services, LLC, Bank of Missouri, Capital One, N.A., First Premier Bank, Chase Bank USA N.A. and Synchrony Bank
Case Number: 1:2019cv00106
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Raymond P Moore
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 131 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Scheduling/Status Conference held on 3/11/2019 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The Clerk of the Court shall update Plaintiff Brian Baths address to 5994 South Holly Street, Unit 244, Greenwood Village, CO 80111. The court shall mail copies of Minute Orders 129 , and 130 , to Mr. Bath at the updated address. On or before March 25, 2019, Equifax Information Services LLC and Mr. Bath shall meet and confer regarding any motion to enforce or any motion to amend. A Scheduling Conference set for 4/24/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. FTR: Courtroom A-502. (bwilk, )
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MINUTE ORDER: This matter is before the Court sua sponte upon review of Plaintiff's motions for "full or partial" summary judgment directed against Defendants Experian #91 and Trans Union #106 , which have been referred to the Magistrate Judge for consideration. The Court's review shows the motions fail to comply with Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards governing motions for summary judgment. Although the motions are noncompliant, the Court allows them in this instance as Defendant Experian has already responded to the motion for summary judgment #128 . Nonetheless, Plaintiff is reminded that, although he proceeds pro se, he must comply with all applicable rules and standards and his failure to do so may result in his filings being summarily stricken or denied. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 3/11/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MINUTE ORDER : This matter comes before the court sua sponte on clarification of the Minute Order 109 issued 02/26/2019. In that Order, the court denied Plaintiff's numerous requests to strike various Defense pleadings and motions, but the Order only specifically addressed Plaintiff's pleadings which the court construed as a Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and to Strike the Motion to Dismiss, found at docket entries #98 and #99 . (To the extent these pleadings could be construed as independent motions for summary judgment, the court declines to so construe them given that D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1(d) provides that a Motion may not be made as part of a Response to another Motion.) However, docket entries #91 and #106 are combined Motions to Strike Defendant's Answer and Motions for Summary Judgment. The court's order denied these Motions solely as they sought to strike Defendants' Answers; docket entries #91 and #106 otherwise remain pending as Motions for Summary Judgment. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3.11.2019. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, )
March 8, 2019 Filing 128 RESPONSE to #91 MOTION for Order to Grant Full or Partial Summary Judgment for Plaintiff filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Donna Woo In Support of Opposition)(Woo, Donna)
March 8, 2019 Filing 127 RESPONSE to #91 MOTION for Order to Strike Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s Answer filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Woo, Donna)
March 8, 2019 Filing 126 REPLY in Support of Motion of Defendant American Express National Bank to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Defendant American Express Company. (Backer, Kali)
March 7, 2019 Filing 125 REPLY to Response to #89 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Defendant LexisNexis Risk Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Llewellyn, Scott)
March 7, 2019 Filing 124 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sarah E. Barr on behalf of LexisNexis Risk Solutions, Inc.Attorney Sarah E. Barr added to party LexisNexis Risk Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft) (Barr, Sarah)
March 6, 2019 Filing 123 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kristin Lee Marker on behalf of Trans Union LLCAttorney Kristin Lee Marker added to party Trans Union LLC(pty:dft) (Marker, Kristin)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting #116 and #119 Motions for Leave to Appear Telephonically at the 3/11 Status Conference. Donna Woo, counsel for Experian, and Alisa Taormina, counsel for American Express, are granted leave to appear telephonically by calling 303.335.2600 at the designated time. Counsel is advised to coordinate with Plaintiff and other counsel appearing telephonically in order to call in on one telephone line. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3.6.2019. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, )
March 5, 2019 Filing 121 MEMORANDUM regarding #119 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Scheduling Conference filed by American Express Company. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 3/5/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
March 5, 2019 Filing 120 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brian Charles Frontino on behalf of American Express CompanyAttorney Brian Charles Frontino added to party American Express Company(pty:dft) (Frontino, Brian)
March 5, 2019 Filing 119 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Scheduling Conference by Defendant American Express Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Taormina, Alisa)
March 5, 2019 Filing 118 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Alisa Marie Taormina on behalf of American Express CompanyAttorney Alisa Marie Taormina added to party American Express Company(pty:dft) (Taormina, Alisa)
March 5, 2019 Filing 117 MEMORANDUM regarding #116 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at the Scheduling Conference filed by Experian Information Solutions Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 3/5/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
March 4, 2019 Filing 116 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at the Scheduling Conference by Defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Woo, Donna)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting #112 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically. Lauren Wood may appear telephonically by contacting chambers at 303.335.2600 at the designated time. Additionally, Ms. Wood is charged with coordinating a phone call with Plaintiff beforehand so the parties call in on one line. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3.4.2019. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, )
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER OF DISMISSAL as to Defendant Bank of America, N.A. with Prejudice. The Plaintiff's claims and complaint as against Defendant Bank of America, N.A., only are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. All other Defendants remain in the case. ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 3/4/2019. (cthom, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 113 MEMORANDUM regarding #112 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at the Scheduling Conference filed by Trans Union LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 3/4/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
March 4, 2019 Filing 112 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at the Scheduling Conference by Defendant Trans Union LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Wood, Lauren)
March 1, 2019 Filing 111 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party Bank of America, N.A. by Defendant Bank of America. (Edwards, Erin)
February 27, 2019 Filing 110 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Woo, Donna)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER : Before the court are four combined responses/motions filed by Plaintiff Brian Bath, seeking to strike the pending Motions to Dismiss: #91 #98 #99 #106 . Plaintiff provides absolutely no legal basis for the court to strike the Motions to Dismiss and accordingly the court summarily denies the requests. The court will consider the combined response/motions as substantive responses to the corresponding Motions to Dismiss. Also before the court is Plaintiff's request to appear telephonically at the March 11, 2019 Status Conference at 10:00 AM #100 because it would be burdensome to travel from Colorado Springs. The court notes that Plaintiff's address is listed as the far-closer Greenwood Village and most of his mail provides a Greenwood Village address. E.g., [#98 at 9]. If Plaintiff has moved, he must immediately provide the court with an updated mailing address under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c). In the interim, Plaintiff's request is granted and he may appear telephonically by calling 303.335.2600 at the designated time. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 2.26.2019. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, )
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER: This matter is before the Court sua sponte. Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment #105 is hereby STRICKEN for failure to provide a separate statement of undisputed material facts as required by Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards (Section IV.B.2 and Exhibit 1). Plaintiff may submit a compliant Motion for Summary Judgment on or before March 5, 2019.SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 2/26/2019. (Text Only Entry ) (rmsec )
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MEMORANDUM regarding #106 MOTION for Order to filed by Brian Bath. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 2/26/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
February 25, 2019 Filing 106 MOTION "Response to Motion to Strike from the Record Defendant Trans Union Answer and Defenses and in the Alternative Grant Full or Partial Summary Judgment for Plaintiff Bath," by Plaintiff Brian Bath. (cthom, ) Modified on 3/11/2019 to add gavel back in. (nmarb, ).
February 25, 2019 Filing 105 STRICKEN MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Brian Bath. (cthom, ) Modified on 2/26/2019 (rmsec, ).
February 25, 2019 Filing 104 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lauren Michelle Wood on behalf of Trans Union LLCAttorney Lauren Michelle Wood added to party Trans Union LLC(pty:dft) (Wood, Lauren)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Barclays Bank, PLC. All claims against Barclays Bank, PLC, set out in the Complaint herein, are hereby DISMISSED, with prejudice and there being no just reason for delay, this Order shall be deemed FINAL upon entry, pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 54(b). ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 2/25/2019. (cthom, )
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MEMORANDUM regarding #98 MOTION for Order to filed by Brian Bath, #99 MOTION for Order to filed by Brian Bath. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 2/25/2019. (rmsec )
February 25, 2019 Filing 101 MEMORANDUM regarding #100 MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Brian Bath. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 2/25/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
February 22, 2019 Filing 100 MOTION for Leave to Appear at Status Conference via Telephone by Plaintiff Brian Bath. (cthom, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 99 MOTION "Answer and Motion to Strike from the Record Defendant Lexis Nexis Risk Solutions Motion to Dismiss and in the Alternative Grant Full or Partial Summary Judgment for Plaintiff Bath" by Plaintiff Brian Bath. (cthom, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 98 MOTION "Answer and Motion to Strike from he Record Defendant American Express Company Motion Dismiss and in the Alternative Grant Full or Partial Summary Judgment for Plaintiff Bath" by Plaintiff Brian Bath. (cthom, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 97 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice stipulated between Plaintiff and Barclays Bank by Defendant Barclays Bank PLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order for Joint Stipulated Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice)(Derwinski, Anthony)
February 20, 2019 Filing 96 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party CHASE BANK USA N.A. by Defendant J.P. Morgan Chase National Corporate Services. (Kilgore, Kelly)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER of Dismissal as to Defendant Onemain Financial Services, Inc. pursuant to #84 Stipulation to Dismiss. Plaintiff's claims and complaint asagainst Defendant OneMain Financial Services, Inc., only are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. All other Defendants remain in the case. ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 2/20/2019. (cthom, )
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MINUTE ORDER : With the Notice of Settlement between Plaintiff and Defendant Wells Fargo #87 the Dismissal Paper deadline is set for on or before 03/14/2019. With the Notice of Settlement between Plaintiff and Defendant Capital One #93 the Dismissal Paper deadline is set for on or before 03/19/2019. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 2.20.2019. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 93 NOTICE of Settlement by Defendant Capital One, N.A. (Schindler, Alan)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MEMORANDUM regarding #89 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by LexisNexis Risk Solutions, Inc., #88 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by American Express Company, #91 MOTION for Order to filed by Brian Bath. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 2/19/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
February 19, 2019 Filing 91 MOTION "Answer and Motion to Strike from the Record Defendant Experian Information Solutions Answer and in the Alternative Grant Full or Partial Summary Judgment for Plaintiff Bath" by Plaintiff Brian Bath. (cthom, ) Modified on 3/11/2019 to add gavel back in. (nmarb, ).
February 19, 2019 Filing 90 ANSWER to #71 Amended Complaint, by Trans Union LLC.(Olson, Elizabeth)
February 19, 2019 Filing 89 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint by Defendant LexisNexis Risk Solutions, Inc.. (Llewellyn, Scott)
February 19, 2019 Filing 88 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Defendant American Express Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Backer, Kali)
February 14, 2019 Filing 87 NOTICE of Settlement by Defendant Wells Fargo Merchant Services, LLC (Elliott, Rebekah)
February 14, 2019 Filing 86 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Robyn Berger Averbach (Averbach, Robyn)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MINUTE ORDER : With Notice of Settlement between Plaintiff and Defendant Barclays Bank #78 , Dismissal Paper due by 3/6/2019. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 2.13.2019. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, )
February 12, 2019 Filing 84 STIPULATION to Dismiss OneMain with Prejudice by Defendant Onemain Financial Services, Inc. (Edwards, Erin)
February 11, 2019 Filing 83 ANSWER to #71 Amended Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions Inc.(Woo, Donna)
February 11, 2019 Filing 82 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party Citibank, N.A. by Defendant CitiBank NA. (Thornton, J.)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #79 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. LexisNexis Risk Solutions, Inc. answer due 2/18/2019. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 2.7.2019. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 80 MEMORANDUM regarding #79 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Class Complaint filed by LexisNexis Risk Solutions, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 2/7/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
February 7, 2019 Filing 79 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Class Complaint by Defendant LexisNexis Risk Solutions, Inc.. (Llewellyn, Scott)
February 7, 2019 Filing 78 NOTICE of Settlement by Defendant Barclays Bank PLC (Derwinski, Anthony)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MINUTE ORDER : With Notice of Settlement between Plaintiff and Defendant Equifax #76 , Dismissal Paper due by 3/6/2019. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 2.06.2019. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, )
February 6, 2019 Filing 76 NOTICE of Settlement by Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC (Garnett, Megan)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MINUTE ORDER : Dismissal papers due on or before 03/05/2019 pursuant to Notice of Settlement between Plaintiff and JP Morgan #74 . By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 2.05.2019. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, )
February 5, 2019 Filing 74 NOTICE of Settlement (Joint) by Defendant J.P. Morgan Chase National Corporate Services (Kilgore, Kelly)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MINUTE ORDER : Dismissal papers due on or before 03/05/2019 pursuant to Notice of Settlement between Plaintiff and Bank of America #72 . By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 2.05.2019. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, )
February 5, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE of Settlement by Defendant Bank of America (Edwards, Erin)
February 4, 2019 Filing 71 AMENDED COMPLAINT against American Express Company, Bank of America, Barclays Bank PLC, Capital One, N.A., Experian Information Solutions Inc, J.P. Morgan Chase National Corporate Services, LexisNexis Risk Solutions, Inc., Onemain Financial Services, Inc, Trans Union LLC, Wells Fargo Merchant Services, LLC, PayPal, Realpage, Inc., First Premier Bank, Synchrony Bank, TD Bank, filed by Brian Bath. Filed by Clerk pursuant to #70 Order.(cthom, )
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #57 Unopposed Motion to Amend Complaint. The pending motions to dismiss (ECF Nos. 38, 42, 47, 48, 54) and motions to strike (ECF Nos. 63, 65, 66, 67) are DENIED AS MOOT. ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 2/4/2019. (cthom, )
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MINUTE ORDER : With the Notices of Settlement filed in this matter, the following dismissal paper deadlines are set: Citibank #41 , on or before 02.21.2019; Discover Financial Services #43 , on or before 02.22.2019; OneMain Financial Services #68 , on or before 03.01.2019. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 2.04.2019. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, )
January 31, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE of Settlement by Defendant Onemain Financial Services, Inc (Edwards, Erin)
January 31, 2019 Filing 67 MOTION to Strike #48 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint by Plaintiff Brian Bath. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(cthom, )
January 31, 2019 Filing 66 MOTION to Strike #42 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Plaintiff Brian Bath. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(cthom, )
January 31, 2019 Filing 65 MOTION to Strike #38 MOTION to Dismiss Party by Plaintiff Brian Bath. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(cthom, )
January 31, 2019 Filing 64 RESPONSE to #54 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Plaintiff Brian Bath. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(cthom, )
January 31, 2019 Filing 63 MOTION to Strike #47 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Plaintiff Brian Bath. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(cthom, )
January 29, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE re #57 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Misrepresentation by Plaintiff by Defendant Capital One, N.A. (Schindler, Alan)
January 29, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE re #57 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Plaintiff's Misrepresentation by Defendant American Express Company (Backer, Kali)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/29/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/29/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
January 28, 2019 Filing 58 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #56 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-00106-RM. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, )
January 28, 2019 Filing 57 Unopposed MOTION to Amend Complaint, by Plaintiff Brian Bath. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only), #2 Proposed Document)(nmarb, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/28/2019: #3 Envelope) (nmarb, ).
January 28, 2019 Filing 56 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Brian Bath. All parties do not consent. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nmarb, )
January 28, 2019 Filing 55 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Capital One Financial Corporation for Capital One, N.A.. (Schindler, Alan)
January 25, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant American Express Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Backer, Kali)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 1/23/2019. A Status Conference is set for 3/11/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Consent Form due by 2/8/2019. (bwilk, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 52 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent LexisNexis Risk Assets, Inc. for LexisNexis Risk Solutions, Inc.. (Llewellyn, Scott)
January 18, 2019 Filing 51 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent T. Rowe Price Group Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion, Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. for Trans Union LLC. (Olson, Elizabeth)
January 18, 2019 Filing 50 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services LLC. (Garnett, Megan)
January 18, 2019 Filing 49 Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC's ANSWER to #3 Complaint, Attorney Megan Rose Garnett added to party Equifax Information Services LLC(pty:dft) by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Garnett, Megan)
January 18, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint by Defendant LexisNexis Risk Solutions, Inc.. (Llewellyn, Scott)
January 18, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant J.P. Morgan Chase National Corporate Services. (Kilgore, Kelly)
January 18, 2019 Filing 46 ANSWER to #3 Complaint, by Trans Union LLC.(Olson, Elizabeth)
January 18, 2019 Filing 45 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Barclays Group US Inc., Corporate Parent Barclays US LLC, Corporate Parent Barclays PLC for Barclays Bank PLC. (Derwinski, Anthony)
January 18, 2019 Filing 44 ANSWER to #3 Complaint, Attorney Anthony E. Derwinski added to party Barclays Bank PLC(pty:dft) by Barclays Bank PLC.(Derwinski, Anthony)
January 18, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Settlement by Defendant Discover Financial Services (Derwinski, Anthony)
January 18, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Capital One, N.A.. (Schindler, Alan)
January 16, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Settlement between Plaintiff and Defendant Citibank, N.A. by Defendant CitiBank NA (Thornton, J.)
January 16, 2019 Filing 40 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party Bank of Missouri d/b/a OLLO by Defendant Bank of Missouri. (Derwinski, Anthony)
January 15, 2019 Filing 39 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Merchant Services, LLC. (Elliott, Rebekah)
January 15, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss Party by Defendant Wells Fargo Merchant Services, LLC. (Elliott, Rebekah)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond American Express Company answer deadline extended seven days to 1/25/2019. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 1.15.2019. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, )
January 15, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Justin Donald Balser on behalf of Onemain Financial Services, IncAttorney Justin Donald Balser added to party Onemain Financial Services, Inc(pty:dft) (Balser, Justin)
January 15, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Erin Elizabeth Edwards on behalf of Onemain Financial Services, IncAttorney Erin Elizabeth Edwards added to party Onemain Financial Services, Inc(pty:dft) (Edwards, Erin)
January 15, 2019 Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #3 Complaint, by Defendant American Express Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only), #2 Exhibit A to Motion for an Extension)(Backer, Kali)
January 15, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kelly Sue Kilgore on behalf of J.P. Morgan Chase National Corporate ServicesAttorney Kelly Sue Kilgore added to party J.P. Morgan Chase National Corporate Services(pty:dft) (Kilgore, Kelly)
January 15, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kali R. Backer on behalf of American Express CompanyAttorney Kali R. Backer added to party American Express Company(pty:dft) (Backer, Kali)
January 15, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Rebekah Lee Wallace Elliott on behalf of Wells Fargo Merchant Services, LLC Attorney Rebekah Lee Wallace Elliott added to party Wells Fargo Merchant Services, LLC (pty:dft) (Elliott, Rebekah)
January 15, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by James D. Kilroy on behalf of Wells Fargo Merchant Services, LLC Attorney James D. Kilroy added to party Wells Fargo Merchant Services, LLC (pty:dft) (Kilroy, James)
January 14, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Donna Woo on behalf of Experian Information Solutions IncAttorney Donna Woo added to party Experian Information Solutions Inc(pty:dft) (Woo, Donna)
January 14, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Elizabeth K. Olson on behalf of Trans Union LLCAttorney Elizabeth K. Olson added to party Trans Union LLC(pty:dft) (Olson, Elizabeth)
January 14, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Benton Jordan Barton on behalf of Trans Union LLCAttorney Benton Jordan Barton added to party Trans Union LLC(pty:dft) (Barton, Benton)
January 11, 2019 Filing 26 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cmadr, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 25 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 24 STATE COURT ORDER granting Defendant Trans Union LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint signed by Denver District Judge Morris B. Hoffman. (cmadr, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 23 STATE COURT ORDER granting Defendant Capital One, N.A.S Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint signed by Denver District Judge Morris B. Hoffman. (cmadr, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 22 STATE COURT ORDER granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint singed by Denver District Judge Morris B. Hoffman. (cmadr, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 21 Onemain Financial Services, Inc.'s ANSWER to #3 Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint, by Onemain Financial Services, Inc.(cmadr, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 20 Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s ANSWER to #3 Plaintiff's Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions Inc.(cmadr, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 19 STATE COURT ORDER Granting Agreed Motion for Extension of Time for LexisNexis Risk Solutions Inc. to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint signed by Denver District Judge J. Eric Elliff. (cmadr, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 18 STATE COURT ORDER Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint signed by Denver District Court Judge J. Eric Elliff. (cmadr, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint upon Experian Information Solutions, Inc on 12/14/2018 (cmadr, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint upon Trans Union, LLC on 12/14/2018 (cmadr, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint upon Equifax Information Services, LLC on 12/14/2018 (cmadr, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint upon LexisNexis Risk Solutions Inc. on 12/14/2018 (cmadr, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint upon American Express Company on 12/14/2018 (cmadr, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint upon J.P. Morgan Chase National Corporate Services, Inc. on 12/14/2018 (cmadr, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint upon Onemain Financial Services, Inc on 12/14/18 (cmadr, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint upon Capital One, N.A. on 12/14/2018 (cmadr, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint upon Citibank, N.A. on 12/14/2018 (cmadr, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint upon Wells Fargo Merchant Services on 12/14/2018 (cmadr, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint upon Barclay's Bank PLC on 12/14/2018 (cmadr, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint upon Bank of Missouri on 12/14/2018 (cmadr, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint upon Discover Financial Services on 12/14/2018 (cmadr, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint upon Bank of America on 12/14/2018 (cmadr, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 Class Action COMPLAINT against American Express Company, Bank of America, Bank of Missouri, Barclays Bank PLC, Capital One, N.A., CitiBank NA, Discover Financial Services, Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions Inc, J.P. Morgan Chase National Corporate Services, LexisNexis Risk Solutions, Inc., Onemain Financial Services, Inc, Trans Union LLC, Wells Fargo Merchant Services, LLC, filed by Brian Bath.(cmadr, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (cmadr, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Experian Information Solutions Inc from Denver County District Court, Case Number 2018cv630. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6480216), filed by Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit Exhibit A, #8 Exhibit Exhibit A, #9 Exhibit Exhibit A, #10 Exhibit Exhibit A, #11 Exhibit Exhibit A, #12 Exhibit Exhibit A, #13 Exhibit Exhibit A, #14 Exhibit Exhibit A, #15 Exhibit Exhibit A, #16 Exhibit Exhibit A, #17 Exhibit Exhibit A, #18 Exhibit Exhibit A, #19 Exhibit Exhibit A, #20 Exhibit Exhibit A, #21 Exhibit Exhibit A, #22 Exhibit Exhibit A, #23 Exhibit Exhibit A, #24 Exhibit Exhibit A, #25 Exhibit Exhibit A, #26 Exhibit Exhibit A, #27 Exhibit Exhibit A, #28 Exhibit Exhibit A, #29 Exhibit Exhibit A, #30 Exhibit Exhibit A, #31 Exhibit Exhibit A, #32 Exhibit Exhibit A, #33 Exhibit Exhibit A, #34 Exhibit Exhibit A, #35 Exhibit Exhibit A, #36 Exhibit Exhibit A, #37 Exhibit Exhibit A, #38 Exhibit Exhibit A, #39 Exhibit Exhibit A, #40 Exhibit Exhibit A, #41 Exhibit Exhibit A, #42 Exhibit Exhibit A, #43 Exhibit Exhibit A, #44 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Averbach, Robyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bath v. Experian Information Solutions Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc
Represented By: Robyn Berger Averbach
Represented By: Donna Woo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of Missouri, dba OLLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiBank NA
Represented By: J. Matt Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank, (USA) NA.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Benton Jordan Barton
Represented By: Elizabeth K. Olson
Represented By: Lauren Michelle Wood
Represented By: Kristin Lee Marker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Bank PLC
Represented By: Anthony E. Derwinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discover Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P Morgan Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Company
Represented By: Alisa Marie Taormina
Represented By: Brian Charles Frontino
Represented By: Kali R. Backer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Merchant Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Megan Rose Garnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Onemain Financial Services, Inc
Represented By: Justin Donald Balser
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LexisNexis Risk Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Scott F. Llewellyn
Represented By: Sarah E. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Realpage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PayPal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Merchant Services, LLC
Represented By: Rebekah Lee Wallace Elliott
Represented By: James D. Kilroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of Missouri
Represented By: Anthony E. Derwinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One, N.A.
Represented By: Alan Daniel Schindler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Premier Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank USA N.A.
Represented By: Kelly Sue Kilgore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synchrony Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Bath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?