Jordan v. McCann et al

Plaintiff: Laymon L. Jordan
Defendant: Denver Enforcement Agent, Morris B. Hoffman, Taylor Critchell, Beth McCann and Denver Colorado Court of Sessions
Case Number: 1:2019cv00107
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER by Plaintiff Laymon L. Jordan. (angar, )
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff again is directed to provide a certified account statement for the six months immediately preceding the filing of this action. If Plaintiff fails to comply within the time now allowed to cure the deficiency the action will be dismissed without notice. No further extensions of time to cure the deficiencies will be granted without just cause, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 2/19/2019. (angar, )
February 4, 2019 Filing 7 Prisoner MOTION for Appointment of Counsel, by Plaintiff Laymon L. Jordan. (angar, )
January 25, 2019 Filing 6 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, by Plaintiff Laymon L. Jordan. (angar, )
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER re: Deficiencies, by Plaintiff Laymon L. Jordan. (angar, )
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency. Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiency within thirty days from the date of this Order the action will be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 1/14/2019. (angar, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Laymon L. Jordan. (cmadr, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT against Taylor Critchell, Denver Colorado Court of Sessions, Denver Enforcement Agent, Morris B. Hoffman, Beth McCann, filed by Laymon L. Jordan. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(cmadr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan v. McCann et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denver Enforcement Agent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris B. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Critchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denver Colorado Court of Sessions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laymon L. Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?