Lange v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.

Plaintiff: Kelli Lange
Defendant: Wal-Mart Inc. and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00110
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y Daniel
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Filing 18 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Larson, Ashley)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/11/2019 at 10:00 AM is hereby Vacated and re-set for 3/13/2019 01:00 PM in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on February 26, 2019. Text Only Entry (gpgsec, )
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically. The parties are to coordinate so that all parties who want to appear telephonically are on one line at the time the call is placed to the courtroom at (970) 241-8932, Extension 8235. The Court does not have the ability to conference multiple parties at the same time. Parties are urged to be mindful to use capable audio/telephone devices so that audio quality is maintained; if audio quality is insufficient, the matter may need to be rescheduled. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on February 14, 2019. Text Only Entry (gpgsec, )
February 14, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM regarding #14 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically For The Scheduling Conference On March 11, 2019 filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 2/14/19. Text Only Entry (rkeec)
February 14, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically For The Scheduling Conference On March 11, 2019 by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Larson, Ashley)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, Set/Reset Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 3/11/2019 10:00 AM in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. A Scheduling Conference is set in GRAND JUNCTION, Colorado at the Wayne Aspinall Federal Building - United States Courthouse, 400 Rood Avenue, Grand Junction, CO 81501 before U.S. Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. The parties shall comply with the Instructions to Scheduling Order for U.S. Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher which can be found at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Parties concerned regarding travel time and expense to Grand Junction for appearances before the Magistrate Judge are referred to this Magistrate Judge's policy in that regard which can be found at the above website. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on February 6, 2019. Text Only Entry (gpgsec, )
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This matter has its factual nexus in Mesa County, Colorado. According to the Court's Revised Jury Plan for Random Jury Selection, this case is therefore properly designated for Jury Division 3. Because the jury will be drawn from that Division, it is appropriate that the case be managed, for pretrial purposes, by Magistrate Judge Gallagher in Grand Junction. Accordingly, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1 (a), and as approved by the Chief Judge of the Court, the undersigned directs that the Clerk of the Court reassign this action to Magistrate Judge Gallagher as the referral judge. All further pleadings in this case shall reflect the case number of 19-cv-00110-WYD-GPG, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 1/30/2019. (evana, )
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 3/5/2019 09:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 1/23/2019. (jgonz, )
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for non-dispositive matters. That pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge is designated to conduct proceedings in this civil action as follows: (1) Convene a scheduling conference under Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2. (2) Conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause. (3) Hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. (4) Alternative Dispute Resolution Authority: Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge, or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. It is further ORDERED that parties and counsel shall be familiar and comply with the above judge's requirements found at www.cod.uscourts.gov. By Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 1/22/19. Text Only Entry (rkeec)
January 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Phillip Thomas Reither on behalf of Kelli LangeAttorney Phillip Thomas Reither added to party Kelli Lange(pty:pla) (Reither, Phillip)
January 21, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant's ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc..(Larson, Ashley)
January 11, 2019 Filing 7 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (dbera, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (dbera, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 STATE COURT ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Plaintiff. By Lance Phillip Timbreza, District Court Judge, Mesa County on 1/10/2019.(dbera, ) Modified to correct docket on 1/14/2019 (dbera, ).
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons, Complaint and Jury Demand, Civil Cover Sheet upon Emily Rauch for Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. on 12/14/2018 (dbera, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., filed by Kelli Lange.(dbera, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Inc. from Mesa County District Court, Case Number 2018CV30572. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6480766), filed by Wal-Mart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- Sec of State Docs, #3 Exhibit C- State Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit D-Affidavit of Service, #5 Exhibit E- Notice of Intent to Remove, #6 Exhibit F- Summons, #7 Exhibit G- Motion for Extension of Time, #8 Exhibit H - Proposed Order re Motion for Extension of Time, #9 Exhibit I- Order re Motion for Extension of Time, #10 Exhibit J- Register of Actions)(Larson, Ashley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lange v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Inc.
Represented By: Ashley Ricketson Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley Ricketson Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelli Lange
Represented By: Phillip Thomas Reither
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?