Ngouan v. Cissna et al

Plaintiff: Amoikon Francois Xavier Ngouan
Defendant: Daniel Renaud, Brian Lutz, Lee Francis Cissna and Kirstjen Nielsen
Case Number: 1:2019cv00128
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: William J Martinez
2 Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Filing 11 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter: Status Conference held on 3/4/2019. Status Conference set for 4/30/2019 02:30 PM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. FTR: Courtroom C205. (slibi, )
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER denying #8 Plaintiffs Motion to Reschedule Status Conference, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 3/01/2019. (slibi, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM regarding #8 MOTION for Hearing/Conference filed by Amoikon Francois Xavier Ngouan. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/1/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Reschedule Status Conference, by Plaintiff Amoikon Francois Xavier Ngouan. (angar, )
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 1/22/2019. Status Conference set for 3/4/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (tsher, )
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2018 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 1/ 18/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Magistrate Judge Neureiter, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned to this case, is designated to conduct ALLMTN proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 1/18/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING REASSIGNMENT. Under D.C.COLO.LAPR 16.1(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, I order that this case be removed from the AP docket and be randomly drawn to a merits judge. The clerk of the court shall assign this case to a judge for resolution on the merits under the random assignment procedure of D.C.COLO.LCiv.R 40.1. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 01/17/2019. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge William J. Martinez. All future pleadings should be designated as19-cv-00128-WJM. (athom, )
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Summons Issued in paper format in the Clerks Office. (rroge, )
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lee Francis Cissna, Brian Lutz, Kirstjen Nielsen, Daniel Renaud Filing Fee: 400.00 Receipt Number: COX088538, filed by Amoikon Francois Xavier Ngouan.(rroge, ) Modified on to correct Main Document 1/15/2019 (rroge, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ngouan v. Cissna et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Renaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Lutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Francis Cissna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amoikon Francois Xavier Ngouan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?