Whitney v. Wenthe
Plaintiff: Kenneth Whitney
Defendant: Roger Wenthe
Case Number: 1:2019cv00145
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2410
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Filing 10 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal or stipulation to dismiss filed in this case on 2/20/19. Text Only Entry (nmarb, )
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Dismissing Case with Prejudice. The parties have filed a #8 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal of Case on February 20, 2019, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the case is DISMISSED with prejudice, with each party to bear their own fees, costs, and expenses. The Clerk of Court shall close this matter. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 2/21/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc2, )
February 20, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case by Defendant Roger Wenthe. (Carter, William)
January 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE Register of Actions pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1(b) by Defendant Roger Wenthe (Carter, William)
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE REGARDING PRO SE PARTIES. Issued by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 1/17/2019. (skclc2, )
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference is set for 3/7/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 2/28/2019. The Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF #4 ) is due 2/28/2019. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 1/17/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc2, )
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. Form mailed to plaintiff in paper format. (dbera, )
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Roger Wenthe, filed by Kenneth Whitney.(dbera, )
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Roger Wenthe from Arapahoe County District Court, Case Number 2018CV319., filed by Roger Wenthe. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Carter, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitney v. Wenthe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Whitney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Wenthe
Represented By: William Dean Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?