Jimenez Soto v. Whitaker et al
Petitioner: Edwin Jimenez Soto
Respondent: Johnny Choate, Ronald D. Vitiello, John P. Longshore, Matthew G. Whitaker and Kirstjen Nielsen
Case Number: 1:2019cv00192
Filed: January 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241in
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Filing 13 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the stipulation to dismiss filed in this case on 3/1/19. Text Only Entry (jdyne, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION of Dismissal Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by Petitioner Edwin Jimenez Soto. (Jefferis, Danielle)
February 22, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Johnny Choate, John P. Longshore, Kirstjen Nielsen, Ronald D. Vitiello, Matthew G. Whitaker.(Pestal, Mark)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Granted in part. The response is due Feb, 22, 2019. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 2/20/19. Text Only Entry (rbjsec.)
February 16, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Verified Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, Order to Show Cause, and all other case filings (ECF Docs. 1-7) upon Johnny Choate on 2/15/19, filed by Petitioner Edwin Jimenez Soto (Jefferis, Danielle)
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Respondents Johnny Choate, John P. Longshore, Kirstjen Nielsen, Ronald D. Vitiello, Matthew G. Whitaker. (Pestal, Mark)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: returnable by respondents why the writ should not be granted. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 2/6/19. (jdyne, )
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Clarify. An order to show cause will issue by separate order. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 2/6/19. Text Only Entry (rbjsec.)
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Clarify re 4 Minute Order, by Petitioner Edwin Jimenez Soto. (Jefferis, Danielle)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER re: #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Edwin Jimenez Soto. Once the defendants have been served, the petitioner may set a hearing on notice to the U.S. Attorney. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 2/4/19. Text Only Entry (rbjsec.)
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rvill, )
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2241 and Order to Show Cause (Filing fee $ 5, Receipt Number 1082-6495957)Attorney Danielle C. Jefferis added to party Edwin Jimenez Soto(pty:pet), filed by Edwin Jimenez Soto.(Jefferis, Danielle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jimenez Soto v. Whitaker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Johnny Choate
Represented By: Mark S. Pestal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ronald D. Vitiello
Represented By: Mark S. Pestal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John P. Longshore
Represented By: Mark S. Pestal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew G. Whitaker
Represented By: Mark S. Pestal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: Mark S. Pestal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Edwin Jimenez Soto
Represented By: Aaron Caleb Elinoff
Represented By: Danielle C. Jefferis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?